Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Legrome D Davis
Case #: 2:15-cv-01243
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2015
Re-opened:Dec 12, 2016
Terminated:Dec 12, 2016
Last checked: Monday Sep 07, 2015 10:52 AM EDT
Defendant
ANGIE'S LIST, INC.
Represented By
FRANCO A. CORRADO
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Morgan, Lewis,& Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JANELL MOORE
Represented By
KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Golomb & Honik Pc.
contact info
RUBEN HONIK
Golomb & Honik, PC
contact info
RICHARD M. GOLOMB
Golomb & Honik
contact info
DAVID J. STANOCH
Golomb & Honik, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 07 2015
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 8/7/2015. 8/7/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
GPO Aug 07 2015
ORDER THAT ANGIE'S LIST'S MOTION TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. ANGIE'S LIST'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 8/7/2015. 8/7/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 13, 2017
59 59 appeal USCA Order Fri 01/13 12:22 PM
ORDER of USCA THAT THIS MATTER IS HEREBY DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FRAP 42(b) WITHOUT COST TO EITHER PARTY. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER IS ISSUED IN LIEU OF A FORMAL MANDATE. (kp, )
Related: [-]