New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:15-cv-01904
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1441ac Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2015
Terminated:Apr 21, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 08, 2015 9:08 AM EDT
Petitioner
Ipayment, Inc.
Represented By
William Francis Dahill
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Respondent
1st Americard, Inc.
Represented By
Craig Thomas Mierzwa
contact info
Respondent
Kelly Grainger
Represented By
Craig Thomas Mierzwa
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Respondent
Greg Grainger
Terminated: 08/27/2015
Represented By
Craig Thomas Mierzwa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2017
59 59 3 pgs service Marshals Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Other Wed 08/02 2:14 PM
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Writ of Execution served on Oppenheimer & Co., Inc.; Kelly Grainger's Bank Account No. G52-1407028 on 5/9/17. Service was accepted by Veronica Yip, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Ipayment, Inc. (sc)
Related: [-]