Felipe Garcia v. Hetong Guo et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01862 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 09, 2015 7:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hetong Guo
|
|
Defendant
Lentuo International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Jiangyu Luo
|
|
Defendant
Jing Yang
|
|
Movant
LAS Group
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Yu Si Ying
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felipe Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
81 | 81
order
Disbursement of Funds
Tue 09/26 9:19 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Re Motion for Distribution of Class Settlement Funds78 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Court finds that Plaintiffs proposals for distribution of settlement proceeds, as set forth in the Distribution Motion and the accompanying Proposed Order (Docket No. [78-1), are fair and reasonable. Accordingly, the Distribution Motion is GRANTED. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
80 | 80
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Tue 09/19 6:59 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF78 filed by Movant LAS Group. (Rosen, Laurence) |