California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:11-bk-38785
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2011
Discharged:Sep 02, 2014
Terminated:Oct 03, 2014

Debtor
Emad F Moawad
234 S Tower Dr Apt 4
Beverly Hills, CA 90211-3431
Represented By
Aslan Khodorovsky
Law Offices Of Khodorovsky & Merrit
contact info
Debtor
Katerina Moawad
234 S Tower Drive, Apt 4
Beverly Hills, CA 90211
Represented By
Aslan Khodorovsky
Law Offices Of Khodorovsky & Merrit
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
725 S Figueroa St., 26th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Alvin Mar
contact info
Ron Maroko
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/26/2013 10:09 PM PST
Tuesday, July 05, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:11-bk-38785) [misc,volp11] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21269526. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Emad F Moawad, Katerina Moawad (Khodorovsky, Aslan)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 Filed by Debtor Emad F Moawad, Joint Debtor Katerina Moawad. (Khodorovsky, Aslan)
Related: [-]
3 3 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Declaration (Individual) Filed by Debtor Emad F Moawad, Joint Debtor Katerina Moawad. (Khodorovsky, Aslan)
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Credit Counseling : Exhibit D- Individual Debtor's Statement of Compliance Credit Counseling Requirement; Certificate of Counseling Filed by Debtor Emad F Moawad. (Khodorovsky, Aslan)
Related: [-]
5 5 Certificate of Credit Counseling : Exhibit D- Individual Debtor's Statement of Compliance Credit Counseling Requirement; Certificate of Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Katerina Moawad. (Khodorovsky, Aslan)
Related: [-]