California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:15-cv-01205
Nature of Suit368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2015
Terminated:Jun 27, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 09, 2015 6:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Groupon, Inc.
Represented By
Michael James Boland
Imai, Tadlock, Keeney & Cordery, LLP
contact info
Stephen Earl Carlson
Imai, Tadlock, Keeney & Cordery, LLP
contact info
Theodore Thomas Cordery
Imai Tadlock Keeney & Cordery, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ADP
Defendant
American Duct Pros, Inc
Defendant
NDCS
Defendant
National Duct Cleaning Services Inc.,
Plaintiff
Frances Mosley
Represented By
Mani Sheik
Sheik Law
contact info
Plaintiff
William Mosley
1230 Market Street, #618
San Francisco, CA 94102
Represented By
Mani Sheik
Sheik Law
contact info

GPO May 14 2015
ORDER APPROVING 32 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/14/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
GPO Aug 13 2015
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 39 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 10/06/2016 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2016 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 1/9/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2017, 1/11/2017, 1/13/2017, 1/17/2017, 1/18/2017, 1/19/2017, and 1/20/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 08/13/2015. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
GPO Aug 14 2015
ORDER GRANTING 14 GROUPON'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint due 11/11/2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
GPO Nov 03 2015
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 41 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
GPO Dec 02 2015
ORDER GRANTING 68 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY GROUPON, INC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
GPO Jan 27 2016
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW ADMISSIONS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 69 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
GPO Mar 09 2016
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 84 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
GPO Apr 08 2016
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, VACATING HEARING, AND DENYING 72 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2016.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/8/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
GPO Aug 15 2016
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman denying 92. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
GPO Aug 15 2016
ORDER GRANTING 92 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
GPO Sep 08 2016
ORDER DENYING 106 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/8/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
GPO Apr 24 2017
ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
GPO May 02 2018
WRIT of Execution issued for the Judgement amount of $123,718.05 plus interest for a total amount of $125,722.01. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)

Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
139 139 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 03/21 4:08 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Frances Mosley, William Mosley. (Sheik, Mani)
Related: [-]