Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10599

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:15-bk-10600
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2015
Terminated:Oct 21, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lima Energy Company
312 Walnut St Ste 1600
Cincinnati, OH 45202-4038
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


1. Lima Energy owes thousands in back taxes (limaohio.com)
Submitted Thu 04/09/2015
Docket last updated: 03/16/2015 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 03/17 9:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Lima Energy Company. (Dehney, Robert)
Related: [-]