Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:15-cv-00214
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2015
Terminated:Jun 10, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 15, 2015 9:10 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Cinco J., Inc.
Represented By
Josh Sanford
Sanford Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Donna Brown
Hilgers & Watkins, P.C.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Rick Thone
Represented By
Allen Vance Wilson
Sanderford & Carroll, PC
contact info
Brian K. Carroll
Sanderford & Carroll, PC
contact info
Defendant
Pressure Trucks, Inc.
Defendant
Rick Thone
Represented By
Allen Vance Wilson
Sanderford & Carroll, PC
contact info
Brian K. Carroll
Sanderford & Carroll, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cinco J., Inc.
Represented By
Josh Sanford
Sanford Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Donna Brown
Hilgers & Watkins, P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2015
ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has until May 8, 2015 to amend its complaint to properly plead the cause of action. Plaintiff is also urged to amend its complaint to more clearly state its remaining causes of action and more strictly comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure pleading standards Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
24 24 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/11 10:55 AM
AGREED ORDER GRANTING23 "AGREED" Motion to Dismiss with prejudice against Rick Thone and Dismissed without prejudice as to Pressure Trucks, Inc. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2015
23 23 motion Dismiss Mon 06/08 1:15 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Cinco J., Inc..(Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 28, 2015
22 22 motion Dismiss Thu 05/28 3:46 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Cinco J., Inc..(Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/28 4:56 PM
Text Order WITHDRAWING22 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Tue 05/19 2:28 PM
First Amended ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cinco J., Inc. by Rick Thone.(Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
20 20 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/13 2:41 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cinco J., Inc., Cinco J., Inc.. (Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/13 10:33 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Rick Thone. (Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/08 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Cinco J., Inc..(Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Account A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B -- Account B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C -- Commercial Credit Application
Thursday, May 07, 2015
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/07 4:22 PM
SCHEDULING AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (ADR Report Deadline due by 9/11/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 6/19/2015, Discovery due by 10/23/2015, Joinder of Parties due by 6/19/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2015, Jury Trial set for 3/21/2016 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2016 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 05/07 2:22 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Cinco J., Inc.. (Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
15 15 misc Advisory to the Court Tue 05/05 2:10 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cinco J., Inc., Cinco J., Inc. (Sanford, Josh) Modified docket event on 5/5/2015 (rg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/29 3:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has until May 8, 2015 to amend its complaint to properly plead the cause of action. Plaintiff is also urged to amend its complaint to more clearly state its remaining causes of action and more strictly comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure pleading standards Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2015
13 13 misc Jury Demand Mon 04/20 4:00 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rick Thone. (Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/15 11:19 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Rick Thone, re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Original Answer and Counterclaims filed by Defendant Rick Thone (Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 04/13 4:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Cinco J., Inc., Cinco J., Inc.. (Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Mon 04/13 3:45 PM
Order and Advisory -Scheduling and Docket Control Order due by 5/13/2015.The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
9 9 notice Notice Fri 04/10 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Amended Removal by Rick Thone(Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
8 8 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/10 10:37 AM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Cinco J., Inc., re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Original Answer and Counterclaims filed by Defendant Rick Thone (Answer to Counterclaim) (Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/09 2:20 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Cinco J., Inc., re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Original Answer and Counterclaims filed by Defendant Rick Thone (Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/02 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh Sanford on behalf of Cinco J., Inc.. Attorney Josh Sanford added to party Cinco J., Inc.(pty:pla) (Sanford, Josh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
5 5 order Order Tue 03/31 11:18 AM
ORDER - Defendant is therefore directed to file an Amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of the parties so that the Court may determine whether there is complete diversity, no later than April 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2015
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/26 4:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Original Answer and Counterclaims by Rick Thone. (Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
3 3 misc Supplement Mon 03/23 4:30 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal Supplemental JS44 by Rick Thone. (Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Correction Mon 03/23 9:01 AM
Notice of Correction: to attorney Brian K. Carroll***ALL NOTICE OF REMOVALS THAT ARE FILED HERE IN FEDERAL COURT ARE REQUIRED TO FILE THE SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE JS44*** re1 Notice of Removal. (rg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2015
2 2 misc Letter/Correspondence Mon 03/23 9:36 AM
Letter/Correspondence to attorney Donna Brown regarding Admission to Practice in the Western District of Texas. (rg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/19 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rick Thone (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-7294903), filed by Rick Thone.(Carroll, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/23 9:03 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Mon 03/23 9:04 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo. (rg)
Related: [-]