California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:15-cv-01286
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 15, 2015 6:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Homejoy, Inc.
Represented By
Maurice Kirby Collette Wilcox
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Ryan Coby Hess
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Zachary P Hutton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J.C. Iglesias
Represented By
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
Adelaide Pagano
Lichten And Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Reyna
Represented By
Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2015
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/20/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
GPO May 01 2015
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation To Stay Proceedings Pending Private Mediation And To Extend Time For Defendant Homejoy, Inc. To Respond To Complaint filed by Homejoy, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/15. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
GPO Jul 27 2015
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/15. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
GPO Jul 29 2015
ORDER re 29 Status Report requesting to stay case for 21 days filed by Homejoy, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
GPO Sep 29 2015
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
GPO Apr 09 2018
Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 TO CONTINUE CMC filed by J.C. Iglesias. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 4/24/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
85 85 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/01 2:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 84 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by J.C. Iglesias. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
84 84 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/26 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J.C. Iglesias(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
83 83 minutes Case Management Conference - Further Wed 04/25 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2018. Parties to submit stipulation for dismissal. FTR Time: 10:34-10:36. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2018)
Related: [-]