California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Case #: 4:15-cv-01284
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2015
Terminated:Apr 25, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 15, 2015 6:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Postmates, Inc.
Defendant
Postmates Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Michael Spurchise
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Melanie Marie Campili Cole
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
John Sung Hong
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherry Singer
Represented By
Adelaide Pagano
Lichten And Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Williams
Represented By
Adelaide Pagano
Lichten And Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Grant
Represented By
Adelaide Pagano
Lichten And Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Tsapatsaris
Represented By
Adelaide Pagano
Lichten And Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryder Vanderheyden
Represented By
Adelaide Pagano
Lichten And Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info

GPO May 28 2015
Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/28/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT.Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.
GPO Jun 05 2015
plies due by 6/16/2015. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/5/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED - PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DOCUMENT NO. 26 ORDER GRANTING 15 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NOTICE TO BE ISSUED TO SIMILARLY SITUATED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). Responses due by 6/9/2015. Re
GPO Jun 05 2015
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 15 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NOTICE TO BE ISSUED TO SIMILARLY SITUATED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). Responses due by 7/13/2015. Replies due by 7/30/2015. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/8/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jun 10 2015
ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation to Continue Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015) Modified on 6/10/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jul 07 2015
ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND DEADLINES FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS X AND XI AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR NOTICE TO BE ISSUED TO SIMILARLY SITUATED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). Responses due by 8/18/2015. Replies due by 8/28/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/7/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
GPO Sep 21 2015
ORDER VACATING HEARING AND REQUIRING JOINT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
GPO Feb 17 2016
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS AND PERMITTING BRIEF SUR-REPLY re 48 Objection. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
99 99 misc Letter Fri 06/15 3:05 PM
Letter Re: to opt in to the case from Evgeny Pashkevich.(cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope