Wyoming District Court
Judge:Scott W Skavdahl
Referred: Kelly H Rankin
Case #: 2:15-cv-00041
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:706(2) Administrative Procedures Act
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2015
Terminated:Jun 22, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 16, 2015 7:37 AM MDT
Intervenor Respondent
Conservation Colorado Education Fund
Represented By
Nathan Maxon
Maxon Law Office
contact info
Michael S Freeman
Earthjustice
contact info
R Benjamin Nelson
Earthjustice
contact info
Intervenor Respondent
Earthworks
Represented By
Nathan Maxon
Maxon Law Office
contact info
Michael S Freeman
Earthjustice
contact info
R Benjamin Nelson
Earthjustice
contact info
Intervenor Respondent
Sierra Club
Represented By
Nathan Maxon
Maxon Law Office
contact info
Michael S Freeman
Earthjustice
contact info
R Benjamin Nelson
Earthjustice
contact info
Nathan Douglas Matthews
Sierra Club Environmental Law Program
contact info
Intervenor Respondent
Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By
Nathan Maxon
Maxon Law Office
contact info
Michael S Freeman
Earthjustice
contact info
R Benjamin Nelson
Earthjustice
contact info
Intervenor Respondent
Western Resource Advocates
Represented By
Nathan Maxon
Maxon Law Office
contact info
Michael S Freeman
Earthjustice
contact info
R Benjamin Nelson
Earthjustice
contact info
Intervenor Respondent
Wilderness Society
Represented By
Nathan Maxon
Maxon Law Office
contact info
Michael S Freeman
Earthjustice
contact info
R Benjamin Nelson
Earthjustice
contact info
Movant
Wyoming County Commissioners Association
Represented By
Gregory M Cowan
Wyoming County Commissioners Association
contact info
Petitioner
Independent Petroleum Association of America
Represented By
Mark S Barron
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Mark Barron
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Alexander Karl Obrecht
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
L Poe Leggette
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Lyle Poe Leggette
Baker And Hostetler
contact info
Alexander Obrecht
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Western Energy Alliance
Represented By
Mark S Barron
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Mark Barron
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Alexander Karl Obrecht
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
L Poe Leggette
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Lyle Poe Leggette
Baker And Hostetler
contact info
Alexander Obrecht
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Respondent
Bureau of Land Management
Represented By
David A Carson
Department Of Justice
contact info
William E Gerard
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicholas Vassallo
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Respondent
Sally Jewell
Respondent
Secretary of the US Department of the Interior
Represented By
David A Carson
Department Of Justice
contact info
William E Gerard
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicholas Vassallo
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


1. Judge Strikes Down Obama Rule on Fracking on Public Lands (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 06/23/2016
2. Fracking Rules Unveiled by Obama Administration (wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 03/21/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
246 246 order Order Tue 11/06 10:12 AM
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.Pursuant to the opinion of the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals dated September 21, 2017, vacating this Court's Judgment, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Skavdahl, Scott)
Related: [-]