Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC et al v. J&E Foods, L.L.C. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paul W Grimm |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-00849 |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 5:19 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
J&E Foods, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
BR IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
DD IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erwin Bonhomme
|
|
Defendant
Jacqueline Bonhomme
|
|
Defendant
J&E Foods, L.L.C.
15793 Livingston Road
Accokeek, MD 20607 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BR IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC
130 Royall Street
Canton, MA 02021 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DD IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Mon 07/27 8:16 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING24 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/27/2015. (at, Chambers) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/24 10:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC. (Yaffe, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 07/14 3:53 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/14/2015. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 07/10 5:25 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct21 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Second) by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Responses due by 7/27/2015(Yaffe, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 06/17 11:02 AM
ORDER granting20 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/17/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 06/15 4:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct13 Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Responses due by 7/2/2015(Yaffe, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 06/10 4:23 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/9/2015. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/05 12:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Responses due by 6/22/2015(Yaffe, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/29 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed J&E Foods, L.L.C. served on 4/10/2015, answer due 5/1/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/28 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia C Colarusso on behalf of BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC (Colarusso, Julia) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/28 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L Yaffe on behalf of BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC (Yaffe, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 05/27 9:17 AM
QC NOTICE:9 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC was filed incorrectly. Please refile with correct service date of 4/10/15. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/26 11:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/16/2015. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/26/2015.(aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Discovery Order | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 05/26 8:13 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 conference call on June 23, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's Counsel TO INITIATE the call to chambers. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/26/2015. (at, Chambers) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/20 11:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DD IP Holder LLC. Erwin Bonhomme served on 4/10/2015, answer due 5/1/2015. (Worthen, David) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/20 11:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DD IP Holder LLC. Jacqueline Bonhomme served on 4/10/2015, answer due 5/1/2015. (Worthen, David) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/20 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DD IP Holder LLC. J&E Foods, L.L.C. served on 4/13/2015, answer due 5/4/2015. (Worthen, David) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/15 10:03 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J&E Foods, L.L.C.. (Windley, Taniya) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 05/15 5:54 PM
Defendant J&E Foods, LLC and Erwin Bonhomme's ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by J&E Foods, L.L.C..(Windley, Taniya) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/02 3:28 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Erwin Bonhomme, Jacqueline Bonhomme, J&E Foods, L.L.C. (rss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Management Order
Tue 03/24 11:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/24/2015. (ats, Chambers) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/24 11:10 AM
NOTICE by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC re1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet)(Worthen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons - J & E Foods LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - Erwin Bonhomme, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - Jacqueline Bonhomme | ||
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/23 11:26 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dunkin Brands Group, Inc. for BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC.. (Worthen, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Jury Demand Supplemental
Mon 03/23 6:17 PM
Jury Trial Demand by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, Supplemental to1 Complaint filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC .(Worthen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Summons for Jacqueline Bonhomme, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Summons for Erwin Bonhomme, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/23 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-5286436.), filed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, DD IP Holder LLC.(Worthen, David) |