ROKOWSKY v. SUNGAME CORPORATION et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-02059 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 5:43 PM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-100
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT KLOIHOFER
|
|
Plaintiff
YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
NEIL CHANDRAN
Terminated: 07/30/2015
|
|
Defendant
JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Terminated: 07/30/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUNGAME CORPORATION
Terminated: 07/30/2015
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Application for Writ (other)
Thu 08/04 2:47 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Execution (supplement) by All Plaintiffs.(VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Writ | ||
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Application for Writ (other)
Wed 08/03 2:34 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by All Plaintiffs.(VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/02 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY (VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 10/02 3:31 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (eaj) |
||
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/30 3:31 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Dismiss. Counts 5 and 6 of Plaintiff's Complaint are dismissed without prejudice, and Defendant Chase is terminated from this case; that if Plaintiff chooses to refile a Complaint against Defendant Chase inthis Court, Plaintiff must do so within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2015. (mmh) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 07/30 12:43 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Chandran; granting15 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Sungame. Defendants Chandran and Sungame are jointly and severally obliged to pay Plaintiff the total amount of $150,000 and judgment shall be entered against each of them in that amount. Plaintiff is granted an extension of 30 days to serve process on Defendant Kloihofer and file notice with the Court of such service. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2015. (mmh) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 07/27 4:14 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 7/27/2015. (jg, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/23 10:01 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sungame Corporation ,15 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Neil Chandran . Motion set for 7/20/2015 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj) |
||
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 06/22 1:12 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Neil Chandran by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY. Responses due by 7/6/2015(VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 06/22 1:08 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sungame Corporation by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY. Responses due by 7/6/2015(VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
qc
QC - Incorrect Event Selected
Fri 05/29 9:23 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Requests for Default12 and13 filed by Anthony Velasquez were submitted incorrectly as Motions for Entry of Default. The Clerk has construed this filing as a Request for Entry of Default. For future reference, when filing a request for the Clerk to enter Default, you should use the event Request for Default which can be found under Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court (kas, ) |
||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 05/29 9:37 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sungame Corporation and Neil Chandran for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (kas, ) |
||
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 05/28 5:07 PM
First MOTION for Entry of Default by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY.(VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Request Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Aff in Support of Default, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service Cert of Service | ||
12 | 12
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 05/28 5:04 PM
First MOTION for Entry of Default by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY.(VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Request for Default, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Aff in Support of Default, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service Cert of Service | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/28 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY. JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015. (VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/28 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY. NEIL CHANDRAN served on 4/2/2015, answer due 4/23/2015. (VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/28 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY. SUNGAME CORPORATION served on 4/2/2015, answer due 4/23/2015. (VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/26 4:03 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/15 1:18 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 13 pgs Affidavit Rokowsky Cert, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Service Cert, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, May 03, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Sun 05/03 7:39 PM
Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 6/1/2015 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj) |
||
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Fri 05/01 12:40 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY re4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (VELASQUEZ, ANTHONY) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/21 9:19 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 5/18/2015 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj) |
||
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/20 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/20 4:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. Responses due by 5/4/2015(TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Christopher B. Turcotte with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as to Chase Only | ||
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/23 4:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEIL CHANDRAN, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., ROBERT KLOIHOFER, SUNGAME CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/23 4:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY. (km, ) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/23 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against NEIL CHANDRAN, JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., ROBERT KLOIHOFER, SUNGAME CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6287326) with JURY DEMAND, filed by YITZCHOK ROKOWSKY.(km, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |