Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:15-cv-00565
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2015
Terminated:Mar 10, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 6:17 PM EDT
Defendant
Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret Mattimoe Sturgeon
Eastman & Smith - Toledo
contact info
James B. Yates
Eastman & Smith - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Hodges McClain
Represented By
Sonia M. Whitehouse
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
Chastity L. Christy
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Thursday, March 10, 2016
49 49 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/10 11:27 AM
Order of Dismissal and Approving Settlement. Case dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs except as otherwise provided by the Settlement. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Parties' Settlement. Related document48 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/10/2016. (K,K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
48 48 motion SEALED MOTION Wed 03/09 3:52 PM
Joint SEALED Motion For Approval of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 47 filed by Plaintiff Hodges McClain. Related document(s)47 .(Christy, Chastity)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Confidential Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release,
Att: 2 Confidential General Settlement and Release Agreement,
Att: 3 Declaration of Chastity L. Christy,
Att: 4 Proposed Order of Dismissal and Approving Settlement
Friday, February 26, 2016
47 47 order Order on Motion for leave Fri 02/26 4:53 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting Joint Motion for leave to File Confidential Joint Motion for Approval and Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Related Documents Under Seal Related [+]. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/26/2016.(K,K)
Related: [-] 46
46 46 motion Leave Fri 02/26 1:19 PM
Joint Motion for leave to File Confidential Joint Motion for Approval and Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Related Documents Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Hodges McClain. (Christy, Chastity)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
45 45 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 02/09 12:46 PM
Notice to take Deposition of Various Individuals on February 18 and February 19, 2016 filed by Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. (Sturgeon, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
order Order Fri 01/22 5:19 PM
Order (non-document) - Attorneys Chastity Christy (Plaintiff) and Margaret Sturgeon (Defendant) contacted a member of the Court's staff today requesting (1) extension of the discovery deadline from January 30, 2016 to February 19, 2016, and (2) a continuance of the status conference from 2:00 p.m.February 2, 2016 to 1:00 p.m. on Wednesday, February 24, 2016. The purpose for the requests is the sudden illness of a family member of Defendant's lead counsel. As there is no objection from Plaintiff's counsel, the Court hereby grants counsel's request. In sum, the new discovery deadline is February 19, 2016, and the status conference will be held at 1:00 p.m. on Wednesday, February 24, 2016. The status conference scheduled for February 2, 2016 is hereby cancelled. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
44 44 order Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Tue 01/12 8:35 AM
Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 1/11/16. Time: 20 min. Status Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/11/16. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
43 43 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 01/06 8:50 AM
Attorney Appearance by Lori M. Griffin filed by on behalf of Hodges McClain. (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2015
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 12/08 10:37 AM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/8/15. Scheduled teleconference held with Attorneys Lazzaro (Plaintiff) and Yates (Defendant). After updating the Court on counsel's progress, the Court scheduled a follow-up teleconference beginning at 3:00 p.m. on Monday, January 11, 2016. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Time: 15 min. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 11/19 3:05 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Scheduled teleconference held on 11/19/15 with Attorneys Christy and Lazzaro for Plaintiffs and Attorney Yates for Defendant, at which time counsel updated the Court on the progress of their discussions. A followup call-in teleconference has been scheduled beginning at 9:30 a.m. on Tuesday, December 8. 2015. The Court will email call-in instructions to counsel. Time: 15 min. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 10/19 3:59 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. The Court held a scheduled teleconference on 10/19/2015 with Attorneys Lazzaro and Christy (Plaintiffs) and Attorney Yates (Defendant). As a result of discussions, the Court scheduled a followup teleconference with counsel beginning at 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, November 19, 2015, initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. The Court expects that, by the next telecoference, the parties will have reviewed and analyzed all relevant business records, Defendant's counsel will have made a counteroffer to Plaintiffs' counsel, and Plaintiffs' counsel will have made a response to that counteroffer. Time: 15 min. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 09/22 12:22 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. On June 8, 2015, the Court held a CMC at which a teleconference was scheduled for Sept. 24, 2015. The teleconference was rescheduled and held on Sept. 22, 2015. Chastity Christy and Anthony Lazzaro attended for the Plaintiffs; James Yates attended for the Defendant. The Court and counsel briefly discussed the status of the case. The parties will continue to discuss possible settlement. A follow-up teleconference is scheduled for Oct. 19, 2015, at 1:00 p.m. Time: 15 min. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
42 42 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 09/10 2:09 PM
Attorney Appearance by Chastity L. Christy filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Christy, Chastity)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Mon 08/31 9:53 AM
Notice [non-document] - 9/24/15 Telephone Conference reset for 9/22/15 at 11:30 AM. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
41 41 notice Notice Tue 08/25 3:30 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Hodges McClain. (Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
40 40 notice Notice Mon 08/10 3:25 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Toby Houghtlen
Monday, August 03, 2015
39 39 notice Notice Mon 08/03 5:18 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Kevin Cook,
Att: 2 William Hancock
Friday, July 31, 2015
38 38 notice Notice Fri 07/31 4:17 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Jason Morris,
Att: 2 Justin Tellez,
Att: 3 Scott Warren
Thursday, July 30, 2015
37 37 notice Notice Thu 07/30 7:31 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dustin Evans
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
36 36 notice Notice Wed 07/29 6:30 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Kevin Cook,
Att: 2 Benjamin DeLong,
Att: 3 Ronald Jeffries
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
35 35 notice Notice Tue 07/28 6:42 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Roger Sutton
Monday, July 27, 2015
34 34 notice Notice Mon 07/27 4:45 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Andrew Chuhy,
Att: 2 Brett Kinsey,
Att: 3 James Mayse,
Att: 4 Ryan Moss
Thursday, July 23, 2015
33 33 notice Notice Thu 07/23 4:42 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Matthew Eads,
Att: 2 Adam Espinoza,
Att: 3 Scott Mowka
Monday, July 20, 2015
32 32 notice Notice Mon 07/20 8:33 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rodney Hayes,
Att: 2 Kyle Johnson,
Att: 3 Pascal Mapati,
Att: 4 Raul Rodriguez,
Att: 5 Chris Zwick
Friday, July 17, 2015
31 31 notice Notice Fri 07/17 7:01 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Christopher Anderson,
Att: 2 Jason Bowers,
Att: 3 Mike Ferrell,
Att: 4 Eric Luna,
Att: 5 Mark Perez,
Att: 6 David Wingfield
Thursday, July 16, 2015
30 30 notice Notice Thu 07/16 6:58 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brian Scott
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
29 29 notice Notice Wed 07/15 7:27 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tim Foster,
Att: 2 Adam Geiger,
Att: 3 Rick Lilly,
Att: 4 Chad Loutzenheiser,
Att: 5 Henry Ochoa,
Att: 6 Lamar Rivers
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
28 28 notice Notice Tue 07/14 7:29 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Antonio Becerra,
Att: 2 David Chester,
Att: 3 Chris Cunningham,
Att: 4 John Friedel,
Att: 5 Stephen Houston,
Att: 6 Jason Hyslop,
Att: 7 Thomas Macke,
Att: 8 Boyd Riggins,
Att: 9 Richard Semrau,
Att: 10 James Williams
Friday, July 10, 2015
27 27 notice Notice Fri 07/10 6:26 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Willie Beckwith,
Att: 2 Adam Brown,
Att: 3 Michael Byrd,
Att: 4 Adam Chrisman,
Att: 5 Rob Gerber,
Att: 6 Brian King,
Att: 7 Nicholas Olszewski,
Att: 8 Matthew Shropshire,
Att: 9 Bert Svenson,
Att: 10 Mark Wildroth
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
26 26 notice Notice Wed 07/08 6:52 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Devin Bovenschen,
Att: 2 Adam Brown,
Att: 3 Ward Koogan,
Att: 4 Christine Macklin,
Att: 5 Drake Marker,
Att: 6 Kevin Mayes,
Att: 7 Michael Richie
Monday, July 06, 2015
25 25 notice Notice Mon 07/06 6:06 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Allen Fairchild,
Att: 2 Mario Garcia,
Att: 3 Max Keck,
Att: 4 Doug Lambert,
Att: 5 Joseph McCoy,
Att: 6 Nathan Nichols,
Att: 7 Troy Saladin,
Att: 8 Matthew Terrill
Monday, June 22, 2015
24 24 notice Notice Mon 06/22 5:53 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Douglas Lambert
Thursday, June 18, 2015
order Order on Motion for order Thu 06/18 9:50 AM
Order [non-document] denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Related [+]. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/18/15.(P,R)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, June 08, 2015
23 23 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Mon 06/08 3:43 PM
Case Managment Plan . Case Management Conference held on 6/8/15. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 1/30/2016. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 8/30/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2016, Telephone Conference set for 9/24/2015 at 12:00 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/8/15. Time: 1 hr.(P,R)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
22 22 notice Notice of Service Fri 06/05 2:25 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.'s Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. (Yates, James)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Stipulation Fri 06/05 2:23 PM
Joint Proposed Stipulation to Conditional Certification and Notice filed by Hodges McClain.(Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Potential Class Members
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
20 20 notice Initial Disclosures Tue 06/02 2:58 PM
Initial Disclosures of Representative Plaintiff and Opt-In Party Plaintiffs filed by Hodges McClain. (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
order Order on Motion to continue Wed 05/27 8:56 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to continue Related [+]. Case management conference rescheduled for 6/8/2015 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/27/15.(P,R)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, May 22, 2015
19 19 motion Continue Fri 05/22 3:50 PM
Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Hodges McClain. (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting Fri 05/22 3:50 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Hodges McClain. (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Wed 05/13 3:13 PM
Order [non-document] granting17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time until May 22, 2015 to file a response to12 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/13/15.(P,R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 05/12 11:45 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 22, 2015 to file response/reply to12 Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. Related document(s)12 .(Yates, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 11, 2015
16 16 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Mon 05/11 11:42 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order . Case management conference to be held on 6/1/2015 at 1:30 PM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/11/15. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
15 15 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/08 2:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. (Yates, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/08 2:42 PM
Answer to1 Complaint filed by Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. (Yates, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2015
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Mon 05/04 12:37 PM
Motion for extension of time until May 12, 2015 to file response/reply to12 Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. Related document(s)12 .(Yates, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Mon 05/04 4:21 PM
Order [non-document] granting13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time until May 12, 2015 to file response to12 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/4/15.(P,R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
12 12 motion Order Tue 04/21 2:58 PM
Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Hodges McClain.(Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Hodges McClain,
Att: 3 Declarations of Opt-In Party Plaintiffs,
Att: 4 Expedited Opt-In Discovery Directed to Defendant,
Att: 5 Unreported Cases
Thursday, April 16, 2015
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 04/16 9:10 AM
Order [non-document] granting9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time Until May 8, 2015 to Answer. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/16/15.(P,R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
11 11 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 04/15 3:44 PM
Attorney Appearance by Margaret Mattimoe Sturgeon filed by on behalf of Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. (Sturgeon, Margaret)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 04/15 3:38 PM
Attorney Appearance by James B. Yates filed by on behalf of Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. (Yates, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 04/15 3:36 PM
Motion for extension of time until May 8, 2015 to answer filed by Defendant Heidtman Steel Products, Inc..(Yates, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 09, 2015
8 8 notice Notice Thu 04/09 5:49 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 David Chester
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
7 7 notice Notice Tue 04/07 8:41 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Angel Fuentes
Monday, March 30, 2015
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Mon 03/30 4:18 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Heidtman Steel Products, Inc. on 3/27/2015, filed on behalf of Hodges McClain Related document(s)2 . (E,P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2015
5 5 notice Notice Thu 03/26 7:38 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Marcus Watson
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Wed 03/25 9:01 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Daniel Sullivan
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 03/26 4:16 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Heidtman Steel Products, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70122920000244857982. (C,B)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
3 3 notice Notice Tue 03/24 7:30 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Hodges McClain.(Whitehouse, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Antonio Becerra,
Att: 2 Julian Scott Berry,
Att: 3 Jason Bowers,
Att: 4 Clarence Gordon,
Att: 5 Rodney Hayes,
Att: 6 Hodges McClain,
Att: 7 Rob Metott,
Att: 8 Adam Probert,
Att: 9 Bryan Steck
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 03/24 9:18 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Heidtman Steel Products, Inc. (C,BA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 03/24 7:57 AM
Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (C,BA)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 03/24 7:58 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh. (C,BA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/23 4:30 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Heidtman Steel Products, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7014116. Filed by Hodges McClain. (Lazzaro, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons