California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:15-cv-02158
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2015
Terminated:Feb 01, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 6:26 PM PDT
Counter Claimant
Empire Distribution Inc.
Represented By
Lindsay M Henner
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Paul L Gale
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Peter N Villar
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
John M Bowler
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Michael D Hobbs, Jr
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Fox Broadcasting Company
Represented By
Molly M Lens
O Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Marvin S Putnam
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Twentieth Century Fox Television
Represented By
Molly M Lens
O Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Marvin S Putnam
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Empire Distribution Inc.
Represented By
Lindsay M Henner
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Paul L Gale
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Peter N Villar
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
John M Bowler
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Michael D Hobbs, Jr
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Gail M Title
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP 2029 Century Park East, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Plaintiff
Fox Broadcasting Company
Represented By
Molly M Lens
O Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Marvin S Putnam
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Cameron Biscay
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Twentieth Century Fox Television, a division of Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By
Marvin S Putnam
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Twentieth Century Fox Television
Represented By
Molly M Lens
O Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Marvin S Putnam
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Cameron Biscay
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
106 106 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 01/11 7:58 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,100 CCA # 16-55577 The judgment of the 9th CircuitCourt, entered November 16, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA OPINION105 AFFIRMED.](mat)
Related: [-]