Bacon v. San Diego, County of et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | William V Gallo |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00639 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 17, 2015 8:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Guy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
San Diego, County of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brett Bacon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss13 . This action is dismissed, in its entirety, as to all defendants and parties with prejudice. The parties each waive any and all claims to attorneys' fees and costs and each bear their own attorneys' fees and costs in this action. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/10/2015. (vam) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Brett Bacon.(Marrinan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Setting Status Conference. The Court vacates the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for September 11, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. and schedules a telephonic status conference for September 11, 2015, at 1:45 p.m. The Court will initiate the telephonic status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/2/2015.(vam) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 9/11/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/11/2015.(vam) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jeffrey Guy, San Diego, County of.(Sanchez, Ricky) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss3 . The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend his original Complaint, if he chooses to do so, within 14 days of this Order. Plaintiffs amendments shall be consistent with this Order, and shall not add new claims or parties without the leave of Court. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/21/2015. (vam) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted
Wed 07/08 11:59 AM
Minute Order Taking Motion Under Submission : Defendants'3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is currently set for hearing on July 13, 2015. The Court finds this matter suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the hearing shall be taken off calendar. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on July 8, 2015. (no document attached) (am1) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Jeffrey Guy, San Diego, County of.(Sanchez, Ricky) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Brett Bacon.(Marrinan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Hearing4 . The Court vacates the previously scheduled hearing on the Motion to Dismiss3 and resets the hearing for 7/13/2015 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3A. The opposition brief and any reply brief shall be filed in accordance with the schedule set forth Civil Local Rule 7.1(e). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/4/2015. (vam) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/4/2015) (vam) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Brett Bacon.(Marrinan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Jeffrey Guy, San Diego, County of.(Sanchez, Ricky)Attorney Ricky R Sanchez added to party Jeffrey Guy(pty:dft), Attorney Ricky R Sanchez added to party San Diego, County of(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (nbp)(jrd) |
|
Saturday, March 21, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against San Diego, County of, Jeffrey Guy, Does 1-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-7916860.), filed by Brett Bacon. The new case number is 3:15-cv-00639-MMA-WVG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Marrinan, Michael)(nbp)(jrd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |