Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Ch Magistrate Judge Andrea M Simonton
Case #: 1:11-cv-24432
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2011
Terminated:Oct 09, 2012
Last checked: Saturday Nov 18, 2017 2:32 AM EST
Defendant
Aventura Limousine & Transportation Service, Inc.
Represented By
Kristopher Walter Zinchiak
Glasser, Kleppin & Zinchiak
contact info
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Chris Kleppin
Glasser & Kleppin, P.A.
contact info
Jason Scott Coupal
Coupal & Associates, Pl
contact info
Defendant
Neil Goodman
Represented By
Kristopher Walter Zinchiak
Glasser, Kleppin & Zinchiak
contact info
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Chris Kleppin
Glasser & Kleppin, P.A.
contact info
Jason Scott Coupal
Coupal & Associates, Pl
contact info
Defendant
Scott Tinkler
Represented By
Kristopher Walter Zinchiak
Glasser, Kleppin & Zinchiak
contact info
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Chris Kleppin
Glasser & Kleppin, P.A.
contact info
Jason Scott Coupal
Coupal & Associates, Pl
contact info
Mediator
Mediator Martin A. Soll
Salmon & Dulberg Mediation Services 19 W Flagler Street Suite 620
Miami, FL 33130
Mediator
John Upchurch
Upchurch Watson White & Max 125 South Palmetto Avenue
Daytona Beach, FL 32115
Plaintiff
Emigdio Bedoya
on his own behalf and all similarly situated individuals 819 NE 199th Street Apt. #203
Miami, FL 33179
Represented By
Brian Lee Lerner
Kim Vaughan Lerner LLP
contact info
Richard Bernard Celler
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Angeli Murthy
Morgan & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Stacey Schulman
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberto Collado
Represented By
Brian Lee Lerner
Kim Vaughan Lerner LLP
contact info
Stacey Schulman
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Arcadio Collado
Represented By
Stacey Schulman
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Ramos
Represented By
Stacey Schulman
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam West
Represented By
Stacey Schulman
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
cleofe collado
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ron Sorci
Terminated: 08/22/2012
Represented By
Kristopher Walter Zinchiak
Glasser, Kleppin & Zinchiak
contact info
Chris Kleppin
Glasser & Kleppin, P.A.
contact info
Jason Scott Coupal
Coupal & Associates, Pl
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2012
ORDER granting 35 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Chris Kleppin and the law firm of Glasser, Boreth & Kleppin, P.A. are disqualified from representing Defendants as counsel in this matter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/30/2012. (ps1)
GPO May 16 2012
ORDER granting 47 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel, Richard Celler, Esq.; granting 82 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel, Stacey Schulman, Esq. and the Law Firm of Morgan & Morgan. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/16/2012. (ps1)
GPO Sep 11 2012
ORDER denying 193 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/11/2012. (ps1)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2014
271 271 2 pgs SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re269 Amended Order by Emigdio Bedoya (Lerner, Brian)
Related: [-]