Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul G Hyman, Jr
Case #: 9:15-bk-15416
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2015
Dismissed:Aug 24, 2016
Terminated:Sep 28, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
MN Corporation of USA
5084 Bright Galaxy Ln
Greenacres, FL 33463-5941
Represented By
David L. Merrill, Esq.
Ozment Merrill
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


1. Palm Beach County Mobil station owner files Chapter 11 (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Thu 04/02/2015
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, October 27, 2016
113 113 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Thu 10/27 4:47 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor MN Corporation of USA Related [+]. (Merrill, David)
Related: [-] 105 Debtor-in-Possession Operating Report,111 Motion to Withdraw Document
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
112 112 misc Debtor in Possession Report Thu 10/27 4:43 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2016 to July 31, 2016 Filed by Debtor MN Corporation of USA. (Merrill, David)
Related: [-]
111 111 motion Withdraw Document Thu 10/27 4:42 PM
Motion to Withdraw Document Related [+] Filed by Debtor MN Corporation of USA. (Merrill, David)
Related: [-] 105 Debtor-in-Possession Operating Report