Wick v. Local Lighthouse Corp.
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 8:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Local Lighthouse Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noah Wick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Tue 10/27 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jessica Therese Stevenson for Plaintiff Noah Wick. (Stephens, Kim) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry)
Tue 08/18 1:07 PM
Case transferred from Washington Western has been opened in UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT for the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 8:15-cv-01315, filed 08/18/2015. (RS) |
||
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Mon 08/17 2:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to transfer venue to Central District of CA, Southern Division; case may be consolidated with 8 15-00802 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 08/17 2:04 PM
Case sent to District of CA, Central, Southern Division by electronic case transfer (RS) |
||
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/13 2:42 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Venue To The United States District Court for Central District of California by parties (Alvord, Chase) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Lifting Stay ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/12 11:56 AM
ORDER LIFTING STAY AND RULE 16(b) AND RULE 23(d)(2) SCHEDULING ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION - Court orders stay lifted; Discovery on class certification completion deadline is 11/12/2015; pltf to file motion for class certification by 12/12/2015; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/31/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/21/2015, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 9/21/2015, Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2015, by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice-Other
Fri 08/07 3:27 PM
MDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER of action to MDL 2644 in re Local Lighthouse Corp Telephone Consumer Protection Act (RS) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 06/22 2:10 PM
ORDER granting Defense Motion to Stay, Dkt. #13 , by Judge James L. Robart.(CC) Modified on 6/22/2015 (MD) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/19 3:01 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Consideration by parties (Alvord, Chase) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Declaration
Wed 06/17 12:49 PM
DECLARATION of J. Will Eidson filed by Defendant Local Lighthouse Corp. re13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Eidson, James) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Wed 06/17 12:47 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendant Local Lighthouse Corp.. Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Eidson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice-Other
Mon 06/01 10:02 AM
NOTICE/MOTION FILED BY LOCAL LIGHTHOUSE CORP FOR TRANSFER OF ACTIONS TO CENTRAL DIST OF CA. Filed before MDL Panel, in re Local Lighthouse Corp Telephone Consumer Protection Act Litigation (RS) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/27 5:04 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Local Lighthouse Corp. (Eidson, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/26 2:01 PM
ORDER re7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey L Sikkema for Local Lighthouse Corp., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/26 1:53 PM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David G Hagopian for Local Lighthouse Corp., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/26 12:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Local Lighthouse Corp..(Weiss, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/26 11:20 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Sikkema FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Local Lighthouse Corp. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4028733 (Weiss, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/26 11:17 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David G. Hagopian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Local Lighthouse Corp. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4028700 (Weiss, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 05/05 9:14 AM
Attorney James W Eidson for Local Lighthouse Corp. added per4 Notice of Appearance. (LMK) |
||
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 05/04 3:04 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/19/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/6/2015, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/04 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Nelson Weiss on behalf of Defendant Local Lighthouse Corp.. (Weiss, Christopher) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Fri 05/01 11:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Richard Paik on 4/18/2015, filed by Plaintiff Noah Wick. (Alvord, Chase) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/30 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Local Lighthouse Corp. (MKB) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/30 11:59 AM
Judge James L. Robart added. (MKB) |
||
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/27 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Local Lighthouse Corp. Attorney Kim D Stephens added to party Noah Wick(pty:pla), filed by Noah Wick.(Stephens, Kim) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |