Hawaii Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert J Faris
Case #: 1:15-bk-00397
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 11, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 10, 2015
Terminated:Apr 22, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Mar 01, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
HOP 1 Enterprises, Inc.
70 E Kaahumanu Ave
Kahului, HI 96732-2176
Represented By
Christopher J. Muzzi
Tsugawa Biehl Lau & Muzzi, Lllc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee.
1132 Bishop Street, Suite 602
Honolulu, HI 96813
Represented By
Curtis B. Ching
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Mar 01 2018
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Confirming Third Amended Plan or Reorganization Dated as of February 21, 2018 (related document(s)119, 120, 150, 292). Date of Entry: 3/1/2018. (JN)
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 12:00 PM HST
Thursday, April 22, 2021
342 342 court Close BK Case - Transfer, Ancillary, Ch 11 w/o Trustee Thu 04/22 8:44 PM
Case Closed. (DM)
Related: [-]