California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:15-cv-02340
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2015
Terminated:Jun 14, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 1:31 PM PDT
Defendant
Legend3D, Inc.
Represented By
Danna J Cotman
Arc Ip Law, PC
contact info
Ariel J Sabban
Arc Ip Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Prime Focus Creative Services Canada, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Popik Glucoft
Irell And Manella LLP
contact info
Joshua Glucoft
Irell And Manella LLP
contact info
Jonathan S Kagan
Irell And Manella LLP
contact info


1. 'Avengers' 3D Firm Brings Patent Lawsuit Against 'Divergent' 3D Firm (hollywoodreporter.com)
Submitted Thu 04/02/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 15, 2018
153 153 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Fri 06/15 10:34 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (iv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation
Thursday, June 14, 2018
152 152 stip Dismiss Case Thu 06/14 4:28 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by Defendant Legend3D, Inc..(Yannuzzi, Daniel)
Related: [-]