Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Pedro A Delgado-Hernande
Referred: Marcos E Lopez
Case #: 3:15-cv-01325
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2018
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2015 8:30 AM AST
Cross Claimant
Bita's Fuel Corp.
Represented By
Jose L. Novas-Debien
contact info
Cross Defendant
Hanni Thabata
Cross Defendant
Mr. Mohamed Thabata
Defendant
Bita's Fuel
Rd. 853, Km. 0.4 Lomas de Carolina
Carolina, PR 00984
Defendant
Hanni Thabata
Represented By
Peter W. Miller
Weinstein-Bacal, Miller & Vega, P.S.C
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Mohamed Thabata
Represented By
Peter W. Miller
Weinstein-Bacal, Miller & Vega, P.S.C
contact info
Defendant
Bita's Fuel Corp.
Rd. 853, Km. 0.4 Lomas de Carolina
Carolina, PR 00984
Represented By
Jose L. Novas-Debien
contact info
Plaintiff
Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.
671 Rd. 337
Penuelas, PR 00624
Represented By
Adrian Sanchez-Pagan
Sifre & Munoz-Noya, Psc
contact info
Amanda R. Collazo-Maguire
Sifre & Munoz-Noya
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
93 93 order Order on Informative Motion Tue 02/20 4:47 PM
ORDER regarding92 INFORMATIVE motion: Noted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 2/20/17. (jhi)
Related: [-]
92 92 motion Informative Motion Tue 02/20 4:28 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Payment of Sanctions filed by Peter W. Miller on behalf of Mohamed Thabata Responses due by 3/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Miller, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Receipt
misc Deposit of Funds Tue 02/20 3:41 PM
DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ 500.00, receipt number PRX100054109.(RE. DKT:91/SANCTION) (arg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
91 91 order Order Tue 02/13 2:31 PM
ORDER: The court has been informed that co-defendant Mohamad Thabat has not complied with the order of the court entered on January 10, 2018, ECF NO. 75. Therefore, the sanctions are hereby increased to $500, due by February 20, 2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 2/13/18.(ft)
Related: [-]