Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:98-cv-00240
Nature of Suit535 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty
Cause28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Case Filed:Jun 04, 1998
Re-opened:Apr 03, 2013
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Miscellaneous
Ada County Prosecuting Attorney
Petitioner
Robin Lee Row
Respondent
Bona Miller
Respondent
Brian Underwood
Respondent
Thomas J Beauclair

GPO Nov 22 2005
ORDER re 382 Petitioner's Objections to Magistrate Judge Decision-Granted in Part & Denied in Part, Clerk of Court shall retain a copy of Ada County Atty Records under seal, Idaho Atty General shall retrieve records and provide to petitioner's counsel for inspeciton and copying, Atty General shall file a Certificate of Compliance once discovery is complete; It is Further Ordered that petitioner shall file a response to 330 Motion to Dismiss Procedurally Default Claims within 45 days of the date of the Certificate of Compliance, reply due w/i 20 days thereafter . Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sb, )
GPO Mar 02 2007
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion of Respondent to Dismiss Procedurally Defaulted Claims 330; w/i 45 days Respondent to file Answer to Second Amended Petition; w/i 45 days thereafter, Petitioner shall submit brief on merits of all non-dismissed habeas claims, and may also file a motion for additional evidentiary development; Respondent's responsive brief on the merits due w/i 30 days of the petitioner's brief filing. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sb, )
GPO Jun 07 2007
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 418 Motion for Reconsideration; Respondents shall answer to Second Amended Petition on or before 7/9/07; Motions for evidentiary development are due by 8/9/07, responses due 9/10/07 and replies by 9/24/07. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by sb, )
GPO Sep 08 2008
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 440 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing; denying 444 Motion for Discovery. Petitioner shall submit a brief on the merits of all non-dismissed claims within 45 days. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg)
GPO Sep 15 2010
ORDER. The parties shall confer with each other and contact the Court's Courtroom Deputy to schedule and evidentiary hearing as soon as is practicable. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall also submit a joint proposed scheduling order setting pre-hearing deadlines. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
GPO Aug 29 2011
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice 293 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court issues a Certificate of Appealability over the Court's resolution of Claims 1, 2, 7 (limited to the allegations ineffective assistance of counsel at the capital sentencing proceeding addresses herein), 35, and 36. The Court shall not certify any other issue or claims for appeal. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
GPO Mar 31 2015
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages 598 is GRANTED. Petitioner's Amended Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment 572 is granted in part and denied in part. A stipulation and notice of any issues of scheduling or application of the law that is to be applied to any aspect of the hearing upon which the parties could not agree shall be filed within 60 days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
786 786 appeal USCA Order Mon 03/03 2:07 PM
ORDER of USCA 23-99004 - Appellees motion for leave to file an oversized answering brief of 27,887 words (Docket Entry No. 35) is granted. The Clerk will file the answering briefand supplemental excerpts of record (Docket Entry Nos. 33 & 34). The reply briefis due within 35 days of this order.as to781 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Robin Lee Row (lm)
Related: [-]