New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:15-cv-02469
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1367 Other Property Damage
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2015
Terminated:Mar 10, 2017
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2015 2:40 PM EDT
Defendant
Intellicell Biosciences, Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Leslie Sanders
Kazlow & Kazlow
contact info
Defendant
MD Steven Victor
Represented By
Stuart Leslie Sanders
Kazlow & Kazlow
contact info
Plaintiff
Allwin Scientific Corporations
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Cell Innovations Pty Ltd.
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Natasha Labban
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
PBH Holdings LLC
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Renenastem, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Schwartz
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Sexaur
Represented By
Douglas Richard Dollinger
The Law Offices Of Douglas R. Dollinger, P.C. & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Leonard L. Mazur
Terminated: 09/03/2015
Defendant
Anna Rhodes
Terminated: 09/03/2015


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
67 67 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/11 11:21 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. ENDORSEMENT: The application by Regenastem Inc. is DENIED. First, a non-natural person, Regenastem, may only proceed by an attorney admitted to practice. Mr. Coretto does not claim to be an attorney and is not listed on the roll of admitted attorneys. Second, if the corporation is in bankruptcy, the action has been automatically stayed. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/10/2017) (cf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
66 66 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/10 11:25 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. . Document filed by Intellicell Biosciences, Inc., Steven Victor. (Sanders, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
65 65 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/10 8:54 AM
MOTION re: for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Antonio Colalillo.(sac)
Related: [-]