Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas L Saladino
Case #: 4:15-bk-40524
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 26, 2015
Terminated:Oct 27, 2015
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 25, 2015

Debtor
D S Resources, Inc.
1701 S 17th St Ste 2D
Lincoln, NE 68502-2641
Represented By
Brooke A Brown
Albers Brown
contact info
Larry V. Albers
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Joseph H. Badami
Chapter 7 Trustee 301 South 13th Street Suite 500
Lincoln, NE 68508
Represented By
Joseph H. Badami
Woods & Aitken, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patricia Fahey
U.S. Trustee's Office 111 So 18th Plz Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102
Represented By
Jerry L. Jensen
Us Trustee'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2015 6:05 PM CDT
Thursday, April 02, 2015
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: INCORRECT ATTORNEY LOGIN/PASSWORD WAS USED AT CASE OPENING. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT LARRY V. ALBERS AS ATTORNEY FOR DEBTORS. HE HAS BEEN ADDED TO THE COURT'S DOCKET AND BROOK A. BROWN WILL BE REMOVED. Related [+]. (nmw)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor D S Resources, Inc.
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $335. Filed by Larry V. Ablers of Albers Brown on behalf of D S Resources, Inc..(Brown, Brooke) INCORRECT ATTORNEY LOGIN/PASSWORD WAS USED AT CASE OPENING. DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT LARRY V. ALBERS AS ATTORNEY FOR DEBTORS. HE HAS BEEN ADDED TO THE COURT'S DOCKET AND BROOK A. BROWN WILL BE REMOVED. Modified on 4/2/2015 (nmw).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule Summary of Schedules
Att: 2 Schedule Schedule A Real Property
Att: 3 Schedule Schedule B Personal Property
Att: 4 Schedule Schedule C Property Claimed as Exempt
Att: 5 Schedule Schedule D Creditors Holding Secured Claims
Att: 6 Schedule Schedule E Unsecured Creditors with Priority Claims
Att: 7 Schedule Schedule F Unsecured Credits with Non-Priority Claims
Att: 8 Schedule Schedule G Executory Contracts and Leases
Att: 9 Schedule Schedule H Co-Debtors
Att: 10 Affidavit Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules
Att: 11 Affidavit Statement of Financial Affairs
Att: 12 Affidavit Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 13 Affidavit Corporate Resolution
2 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 15-40524 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 6401025, amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brooke A Brown on behalf of D S Resources, Inc.. (Brown, Brooke)
Related: [-]