Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-13485

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:15-bk-13416
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2015
Terminated:Sep 20, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC
2865 Wilderness Pl
Boulder, CO 80301-2259
Represented By
Michael J. Pankow
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294

Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
33 33 court Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11) Wed 09/20 10:35 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (aek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
32 32 misc Request To Terminate Court E-Mail Notification Wed 12/14 4:31 PM
Request To Terminate Court E-Mail Notification Filed by Donald D. Allen on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Allen, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
31 31 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Mon 10/24 3:20 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Number 9 Filed by Rosenthal & Rosenthal Inc. (rxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2015
30 30 misc Monthly Report of Operations Mon 12/21 2:34 PM
Report of Operations From 11/1/2015 To 11/30/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 27, 2015
29 29 misc Document Mon 11/30 11:33 AM
Letter Dated 11/11/2015 re claim no. 6-1 filed by Kamon International DMCC . (rxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
28 28 misc Monthly Report of Operations Fri 11/20 12:27 PM
Report of Operations From 10/1/2015 To 10/31/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
27 27 misc Monthly Report of Operations Wed 10/21 3:50 PM
Report of Operations From 9/1/2015 To 9/30/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
26 26 misc Monthly Report of Operations Mon 09/21 4:11 PM
Report of Operations From 8/01/2015 To 8/31/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
25 25 misc Monthly Report of Operations Fri 08/21 11:46 AM
Report of Operations From 7/01/2015 To 7/31/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
24 24 misc Monthly Report of Operations Tue 07/21 5:43 PM
Report of Operations From 6/1/2015 To 6/30/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2015
23 23 misc Monthly Report of Operations Mon 07/13 10:58 AM
Report of Operations From 5/1/2015 To 5/31/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Monthly Report of Operations Mon 07/13 10:57 AM
Report of Operations From 4/1/2015 To 4/30/2015 Filed by Joshua M. Hantman on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Hantman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2015
21 21 misc Schedules/Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 04/16 6:02 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Schedules, Schedules A-H, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC Related [+]. (Pankow, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2015 (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11, 9 Incomplete Case Text Entry
Saturday, April 11, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/11 10:36 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/11/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
Friday, April 10, 2015
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors Fri 04/10 10:39 PM
Courts Notice and BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 04/10/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thursday, April 09, 2015
18 18 order Joint Administration Thu 04/09 4:45 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+]. (jtm)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Joint Administration
17 17 misc Disclosure Regarding Receivers (Chapter 11) Thu 04/09 11:59 AM
Disclosure Regarding Receivers Filed by Rafael R. Garcia-Salgado on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Garcia-Salgado, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
16 16 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 04/08 1:18 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2015 at 01:00 PM at 341 Byron Rogers Room C. Set per directive from the US Trustee's Office. (mjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2015
15 15 motion Joint Administration Mon 04/06 8:58 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Of The Following Cases: 15-13415 15-13416 15-13417 15-13420 15-13421 15-13485 Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/06 3:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Donald D. Allen on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association... (Allen, Donald)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/06 3:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James T. Markus on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association... (Markus, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/06 11:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Alan K. Motes on behalf of US Trustee... (Motes, Alan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 05, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Reassignment Sun 04/05 10:29 PM
Courts Notice and BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Reassignment Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Reassignment Due To Prior Filing or Related Filings
Friday, April 03, 2015
10 10 court Incomplete Case Text Entry Fri 04/03 1:55 PM
MISSING DOCUMENTS REQUIRED TO BE FILED: Disclosure Regarding Receivers,. NOTE: Review pleadings filed to identify which required documents were not actually filed. Related [+]. (bel)
Related: [-] 1" Voluntary Petition
9 9 court Incomplete Case Text Entry Fri 04/03 1:53 PM
MISSING DOCUMENTS REQUIRED TO BE FILED: Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. NOTE: Review pleadings filed to identify which required documents were not actually filed. Related [+]. (bel)
Related: [-] 1" Voluntary Petition
8 8 court Notice of Reassignment (Prior Filing or Related Filings) Fri 04/03 1:49 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. The above-named debtor has filed a bankruptcy petition. There Is A Related Case Pending In This District under Case No. 15-13415 MER. Pursuant to L.B.R. 1073-1, this case is hereby reassigned to the Judge that heard and/or is assigned the related case. Judge Michael E. Romero added to case. Involvement of Judge Thomas B. McNamara Terminated. (bel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2015
7 7 misc List of Equity Security Holders Thu 04/02 7:22 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Verification of Creditor Address Mailing Matrix Thu 04/02 6:47 PM
Verification of Creditor Address Mailing Matrix Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC Related [+]. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11
5 5 2 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 04/02 6:46 PM
List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Thu 04/02 6:45 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Corporate Parents Added to Case: Fresh Produce Holdings, LLC. Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Thu 04/02 6:44 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Michael J. Pankow on behalf of Fresh Produce Sportswear, LLC. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 04/02 6:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11 15-13416 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21766262. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/02 6:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Total Number of Creditors Uploaded: 2. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2015. (Pankow, Michael)
Related: [-]