California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:15-cv-01508
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2015
Terminated:Jun 22, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 29, 2015 8:01 AM PDT
Defendant
TPG Capital, L.P.
Represented By
Lyn Robyn Agre
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Marc Elliot Kasowitz
Kasowitz Benson Torres And Friedman LLP
contact info
Defendant
TPG Global, LLC
Represented By
Lyn Robyn Agre
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Marc Elliot Kasowitz
Kasowitz Benson Torres And Friedman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Levine
Represented By
Jahan C. Sagafi
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info
Monique Chase
Outten Golden
contact info
Tammy Teresa Marzigliano
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 22, 2015
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/22 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Adam Levine (Marzigliano, Tammy) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
18 18 order Order on Stipulation Fri 06/05 3:40 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE SCHEDULE AND THE INITIAL CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 17 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for August 6, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. Joint Case Management Statement due July 30, 2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/05 3:41 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2015
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 06/04 3:40 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /Stipulated Request and Proposed Order to Continue Case Schedule and Initial Case Management Conference filed by TPG Capital, L.P., TPG Global, LLC.(Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lyn R. Agre in support of Stipulated Request to Continue Case Schedule and Initial Case Management Conference
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 06/04 1:38 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint / Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint to July 13, 2015 filed by TPG Capital, L.P., TPG Global, LLC. (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2015
15 15 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/29 3:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Marc E. Kasowitz by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2015
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/28 7:16 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9552967.) filed by TPG Capital, L.P., TPG Global, LLC. (Kasowitz, Marc) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/11 10:13 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TPG Capital, L.P., TPG Global, LLC.. (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
12 12 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/27 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Monique Chase by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/23 2:56 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9467518.) filed by Adam Levine. (Chase, Monique) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2015
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/20 9:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Adam Levine. Service waived by TPG Capital, L.P. waiver sent on 4/9/2015, answer due 6/8/2015; TPG Global, LLC waiver sent on 4/9/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Marzigliano, Tammy) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2015
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/16 2:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adam Levine.. (Marzigliano, Tammy) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/15 11:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Tammy Marzigliano by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/14 2:18 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9440689.) filed by Adam Levine. (Marzigliano, Tammy) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2015
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/02 1:35 PM
Summons Issued as to TPG Capital, L.P., TPG Global, LLC.(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/02 1:32 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/02 10:19 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 04/02 9:48 AM
Proposed Summons. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 04/02 9:47 AM
Proposed Summons. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/02 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against TPG Capital, L.P., TPG Global, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9410341.). Filed byAdam Levine.(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet