Yuichiro Sakurai v. Keiko Kato
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02482 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 30, 2015 8:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Keiko Kato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yuichiro Sakurai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Receipt
Tue 05/19 4:43 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court at Glendale Courthouse, Case No. EC062273, acknowledged on 5/11/2015. (jp) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 05/07 4:46 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Glendale Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Glendale Courthouse. (gk) |
|
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Remand Case to State Court
Thu 05/07 4:45 PM
MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Remand Action to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case Number EC062273, pursuant to Order filed 4/24/201512 . ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) Court Reporter: None. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 04/28 8:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint9 as to Defendant Keiko Kato. (jp) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 04/24 4:13 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; ORDER STAYING REMAND ORDER UNTIL 5/1/2015 by Judge John F. Walter: The Court hereby REMANDS this action to Los Angeles County Superior Court. The Court STAYS this Order until 5/1/2015. Because Plaintiff originally filed this action in Los Angeles County Superior Court, the Court assumes that Plaintiff does not object to the remand of this action. However, in the unlikely event Plaintiff wishes to remain in federal court and thereby waive the procedural defect discussed above, Plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing on or before 5/1/2015. If Plaintiff instead prefers that this action be remanded to state court, Plaintiff may simply decline to file a waiver of the procedural defect. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/24 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yuichiro Sakurai, (Cruse, Joseph) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Fri 04/24 3:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition9 filed by plaintiff Yuichiro Sakurai. (Cruse, Joseph) |
|
9 | 9
13
pgs
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 04/24 3:55 PM
Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Yuichiro Sakurai amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Yuichiro Sakurai(Cruse, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits | ||
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 04/10 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Supplemental Document from State Court Action in re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1(An, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 3, 2015 Minute Order from LASC | ||
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/09 11:52 AM
COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for June 1, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 16, U.S. Courthouse, 312 N. Spring Street, Los Angeles. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 18, 2015. (jloz) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 04/09 11:44 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (cw) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 04/03 4:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 04/03 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jp) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/03 2:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Keiko Kato, (An, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 04/03 2:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Keiko Kato. (An, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/03 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court Glendale Division, case number EC062273 Receipt No: 0973-15489906 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Keiko Kato. (Attorney Lisa Y An added to party Keiko Kato(pty:dft))(An, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 62 pgs Exhibit A to Defendant's Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Defendant's Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Defendant's Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 04/03 3:50 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Keiko Kato, filed by plaintiff Yuichiro Sakuri. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/3/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (jp) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/03 4:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yuichiro Sakurai, upon Defendant Keiko Kato served on 4/28/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Receptionist "Black, Female, 50 years, 5'6", bald, 150 lbs" in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/30/2014 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (jp) |