Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marcia Phillips Parsons
Case #: 2:15-bk-50538
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 13, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 02, 2015
Terminated:Sep 21, 2020

Debtor
Professional Appliance Direct Inc.
3101 Browns Mill Rd Ste 3
Johnson City, TN 37604-4100
Represented By
Charles Parks Pope
The Pope Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Margaret B. Fugate
Trustee 114 E. Market St.
Johnson City, TN 37604
Represented By
Margaret B. Fugate
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
800 Market Street, Suite 114 Howard H. Baker Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Knoxville, TN 37902


1. JC appliance business files bankruptcy, 89 creditors owed (wjhl.com)
Submitted Fri 04/10/2015
Docket last updated: 04/05/2015 8:05 PM EDT
Friday, April 03, 2015
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Charles Parks Pope on behalf of Professional Appliance Direct Inc.. (Pope, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Charles Parks Pope on behalf of Debtor Professional Appliance Direct Inc.. (Pope, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/13/2015 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Meeting Room 111, Greeneville, TN. (Pope, Charles)
Related: [-]
4 4 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:15-bk-50538) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 13838408. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1