Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Evelyn J Furse
Case #: 2:15-cv-00231
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:Oct 19, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 2:38 PM MDT
Defendant
SME Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Brian A. Mills
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Maralyn M. English
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Camille N. Johnson
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Defendant
SME Steel Contractors
Represented By
Brian A. Mills
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Maralyn M. English
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Camille N. Johnson
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaime Robles
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Lopez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Martin Lopez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juventino Perez Mendrano
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Murua
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Olvera
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erik A. Parra
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriel Quintero
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco J. Ramirez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose J. Velazquez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Renato Rodriguez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Federico Carrera
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristian Salcedo
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eder Salcedo
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rogelio Sanchez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sergio Aguilar Santana
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Valdez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arturo Lira
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Carrera
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Cerda
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Corona
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristobal Cortez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julio C. Estrada
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Everardo Flores
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Herlindo Flores
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosendo Flores
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario A. Garcia Marin
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pablo Gomez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Omar Gonzalez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cesar Alejandro Granados
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Valdez Gutierrez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Angel Gutierrez
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Guzman
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Octavio Guzman
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alonso Lira-Damian
Represented By
Matt W. Harrison
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Kathryn K. Harstad
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info
Erik Strindberg
Strindberg & Scholnick LLC
contact info


1. Latino workers file discrimination lawsuit (good4utah.com)
Submitted Thu 04/09/2015
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/19 4:23 PM
ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/19/16. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
28 28 2 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 10/18 2:20 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez, Jose J. Velazquez.(Harstad, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 13, 2016
27 27 utility Motions No Longer Referred Thu 10/13 10:42 AM
Motions No Longer Referred:24 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Sixth Claim for Relief Judge Parrish will handle this motion. (ss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2016
26 26 3 pgs notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 05/26 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Camille N. Johnson filed by Camille N. Johnson on behalf of SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors (Johnson, Camille)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
25 25 93 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/20 2:01 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors.(Mills, Brian)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Strike Fri 05/20 1:56 PM
MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Sixth Claim for Relief filed by Defendants SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Mills, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
23 23 order Protective Order Mon 04/18 11:51 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/18/2016. (las)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
22 22 motion Protective Order Fri 04/15 7:50 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez, Jose J. Velazquez. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Harstad, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/15 7:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: Hugo Vilchez. filed by Federico Carrera, Eder Salcedo, Renato Rodriguez, Cristobal Cortez, Alonso Lira-Damian, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Rafael Corona, Erik A. Parra, Jesus Guzman, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Jorge Carrera, Herlindo Flores, Julio C. Estrada, Octavio Guzman, Jaime Robles, Pablo Gomez, Jose J. Velazquez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Cristian Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Everardo Flores, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juan Valdez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Francisco J. Ramirez, Rosendo Flores, Jose Murua, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Francisco Cerda, Gabriel Quintero, Oscar Olvera, Arturo Lira. (Harstad, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
20 20 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/12 4:29 PM
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and to Add Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/12/16. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/11 1:49 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct2 Complaint,,, and Memorandum in Support Second Stipulation to Amend filed by Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Harrison, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Second Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/23 10:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: Ramon Corona, Eliezer Allende. filed by Federico Carrera, Eder Salcedo, Renato Rodriguez, Cristobal Cortez, Alonso Lira-Damian, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Rafael Corona, Erik A. Parra, Jesus Guzman, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Jorge Carrera, Herlindo Flores, Julio C. Estrada, Octavio Guzman, Jaime Robles, Pablo Gomez, Jose J. Velazquez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Cristian Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Everardo Flores, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juan Valdez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Francisco J. Ramirez, Rosendo Flores, Jose Murua, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Francisco Cerda, Gabriel Quintero, Oscar Olvera, Arturo Lira. (Harrison, Matt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2016
17 17 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 03/22 5:41 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Parties- plaintiffs are to file their Amended Complaint forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/22/16 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/21 3:55 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum in Support complaint to add parties filed by Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez, Jose J. Velazquez. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Harrison, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/16 3:16 PM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/22/16 for Plaintiffs to File Motion to Add Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/16/15 (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
14 14 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/15 6:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Time to File Motion to Add Parties and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Harrison, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 31, 2015
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/31 2:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings for Plaintiff due by 3/15/2016. Amended Pleadings for Defendant due by 3/30/16. Discovery due by 1/16/2017. Motions due by 2/15/2017. Status Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Jill N. Parrish. See order for further deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/30/15. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
12 12 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Thu 12/17 4:18 PM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING.(Johnson, Camille)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 24, 2015
11 11 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/24 4:22 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/24/15. (ss)
Related: [-]
10 10 utility Reassignment to District Judge Thu 09/24 3:01 PM
All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Thu 09/24 2:58 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez, Jose J. Velazquez. (las)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
8 8 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Tue 09/22 2:52 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors. (las)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 09/22 9:52 AM
NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use[LINK:the form on this link] or use the included form for non-efilers and send it to consents@utd.uscourts.gov within 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez, Jose J. Velazquez, Defendants SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors. Form due by 10/7/2015. (las)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/21 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Mills on behalf of SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors (Mills, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/21 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maralyn M. English on behalf of SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors (English, Maralyn)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/21 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by SME Industries, Inc., SME Steel Contractors. Attorney Camille N. Johnson added to party SME Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Camille N. Johnson added to party SME Steel Contractors(pty:dft)(Johnson, Camille)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/27 2:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eder Salcedo, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Jose J. Velazquez, Cristian Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Juan Valdez as to All Defendants. (Harstad, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2015
2 2 60 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/06 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2239963), filed by Federico Carrera, Eder Salcedo, Renato Rodriguez, Cristobal Cortez, Alonso Lira-Damian, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Rafael Corona, Erik A. Parra, Jesus Guzman, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Jorge Carrera, Herlindo Flores, Julio C. Estrada, Octavio Guzman, Jaime Robles, Pablo Gomez, Jose J. Velazquez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Cristian Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Everardo Flores, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juan Valdez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Francisco J. Ramirez, Rosendo Flores, Jose Murua, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Francisco Cerda, Gabriel Quintero, Oscar Olvera, Arturo Lira. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Harstad, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Mon 04/06 12:44 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Federico Carrera, Jorge Carrera, Francisco Cerda, Rafael Corona, Cristobal Cortez, Miguel Alejandro Cueva Vejar, Julio C. Estrada, Everardo Flores, Herlindo Flores, Rosendo Flores, Mario A. Garcia Marin, Pablo Gomez, Jorge Omar Gonzalez, Cesar Alejandro Granados, Jesus Valdez Gutierrez, Luis Angel Gutierrez, Jesus Guzman, Octavio Guzman, Arturo Lira, Alonso Lira-Damian, Joel Lopez, Martin Lopez, Juventino Perez Mendrano, Jose Murua, Oscar Olvera, Erik A. Parra, Gabriel Quintero, Francisco J. Ramirez, Jaime Robles, Renato Rodriguez, Cristian Salcedo, Eder Salcedo, Rogelio Sanchez, Sergio Aguilar Santana, Juan Valdez, and Jose J. Velazquez are directed to E-File the complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (eat)
Related: [-]