Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-12783

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:15-ap-50262
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:Apr 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aerodynamic, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Mark Knight
Represented By
Michael Joseph Custer
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Kay Standridge Kress
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Charlie Kilgore
Represented By
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Defendant
Enrique Fontova
Represented By
William D. Sullivan
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Defendant
Charles Kilgore
201 Whitcomb Rd
Lafayette, LA 70503
Represented By
Charles Kilgore
Pro Se
contact info
Defendant
Mark Knight
278 Carpenter Dr.
Franklin, LA 70538
Represented By
Michael Joseph Custer
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Kay Standridge Kress
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Enrique Fontova
Represented By
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
LQT Industries, LLC
Represented By
Geoffrey G. Grivner
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
Elle Investments, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Moreno Properties, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Casafin II, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Turbine Generation Services, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
FRAC Rentals, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Dynamic Group Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Mark A. Mintz
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Geoffrey G. Grivner
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
Shale Support Services, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Moody, Moreno and Rucks, LLC
Represented By
Henry Perret
Perret Doise LLC
contact info
Stephen W. Spence
Baird Mandalas Brockstedt, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MOR DOH Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
MOR MGH Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Michel B. Moreno
Represented By
Aaron M Kaufman
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
R Chris Harvey
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP
contact info
Alison R. Ashmore
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Jeffrey R. Fine
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Defendant
Dynamic Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Dynamic Industries, Inc.
contact info
Mediator
Edward A. Infante
JAMS Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1500
SanFrancisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Edward A. Infante
Jams
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Halperin, as Liquidation Trustee for the GFES Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Steven K. Kortanek
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Halperin, as Trustee of the GFES Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Steven K. Kortanek
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Horan
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Macauley
Macauley LLC
contact info


1. Creditors seek $230M from stable founder Moreno (drf.com)
Submitted Mon 04/13/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, April 29, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/29 12:33 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-50262 Closed (BA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
581 581 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:11 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]