Arizona District Court
Judge:Neil V Wake
Case #: 2:15-cv-00612
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:Jul 29, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 1:54 PM MST
Defendant
Great Alaskan Bush Company
Individually 2980 Grand Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85017
Defendant
Damian Hartze
Individually 2980 Grand Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85017
Defendant
5832 Incorporated
Plaintiff
Mary Mears
Represented By
David Wayne Hodges
Kennedy Hodges LLP
contact info
Beatriz Sosa-Morris
Kennedy Hodges LLP
contact info
Michelle Ray Matheson
Matheson & Matheson PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Merry Mears
Represented By
David Wayne Hodges
Kennedy Hodges LLP
contact info
Beatriz Sosa-Morris
Kennedy Hodges LLP
contact info
Michelle Ray Matheson
Matheson & Matheson PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, July 29, 2016
36 36 order Judgment - Default Fri 07/29 7:47 AM
ORDER granting35 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and DEFAULT JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that Judgment is hereby entered against Defendants 5832, Inc. d/b/a Great Alaskan Bush Company and Damian Hartze in the total amount of $60,084.23, and interest allowed by law from the date of entry of this judgment until it is fully paid. Plaintiffs are hereby authorized to execute on this final judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 7/28/16. (LSP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
35 35 motion Default Judgment Wed 07/13 8:31 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Merry Mears.(Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
34 34 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 06/28 4:54 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion (Doc.33 ). FURTHER ORDERED extending the time within which Plaintiff file an application for entry of default judgment against Defendant Hartze to 07/13/16, or this action will be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/28/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Continue Tue 06/28 4:04 PM
MOTION to Continue Time to File Motion for Default Judgment by Merry Mears.(Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 06/01 8:38 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff file an application for entry of default judgment against Defendant Hartze by 06/29/16, or this action will be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/31/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
31 31 minutes In-Court Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Fri 04/29 2:41 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V. Wake: In-Court Hearing (set as a Scheduling Conference/Show Cause Hearing) held on 04/29/16. The matter was scheduled for 2:00 p.m. and Defendant Damian Hartze has not appeared. For the reasons stated on the record, default is entered against Defendant Damian Hartze. Discussion is held. Plaintiff's counsel advises the Court she will be filing a motion for default judgment within a month's time. No additional order(s) to issue at this time. APPEARANCES: Beatriz Sosa-Morris for Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 2:21 p.m. to 2:28 p.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
30 30 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/29 3:07 PM
ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE vacating and resetting the 04/01/16, Scheduling Conference to 04/29/16 at 2:00 PM. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall comply with the Court's Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc.27 ) and file with the Clerk of Court a Notice of Initial Disclosure no later than 04/15/16. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall participate and jointly file the Rule 26(f) Meeting and Case Management Report no later than 04/22/16. FURTHER ORDERED if Defendants fail to comply with this Order, Defendants are ordered to show cause on 04/29/16 at 2:00 PM why default should not be entered against them for failing to comply with the Court's orders. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 3/29/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
29 29 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Fri 03/25 12:22 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Merry Mears. (Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/11 4:23 PM
NOTICE re: of Rule 26 (a) Disclosures by Merry Mears . (Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
27 27 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/16 2:19 PM
ORDER ISSUED: Scheduling Conference set for 04/01/16, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. The parties are ordered to provide initial disclosures at least 21 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference in the form required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1). See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 2/16/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Tue 02/16 2:14 PM
ORDER that the Order to Show Cause (Doc.25 ) of 12/30/15, is discharged. FURTHER ORDERED that the original Answer (Doc.10 ) is deemed an answer to the Amended Complaint (Doc.17 ). Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 2/16/16. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
25 25 order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/30 2:41 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Defendant Hartze file an answer for himself to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc.17 ) on or before 01/19/16. FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant Hartze fails to timely file an Answer to the Amended Complaint, default may be entered against him after 01/19/16. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/30/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2015
24 24 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 11/13 7:54 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 5832 Incorporated d/b/a Great Alaskan Bush Company. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2015
23 23 misc Request Wed 11/11 2:34 PM
REQUEST re: Request to Enter Default Judgment by Plaintiff Merry Mears.(Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 02, 2015
22 22 order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/02 1:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that Plaintiff show cause no later than 11/12/15, as to why this action should not be dismissed against Defendant 5832, Inc., d/b/a/ Great Alaskan Bush Company, for failure to prosecute, unless before then default has been entered or a responsive pleading has been filed. FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action against Defendant 5832, Inc., d/b/a Great Alaskan Bush Company after 11/12/15, for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/2/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2015
21 21 service Service Executed Mon 10/12 1:54 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Merry Mears: Proof of Service re: Summons upon 5832, Inc. d/b/a Great Alaskan Bush Co on 10/09/2015. (Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2015
20 20 service Summons Issued Mon 09/28 8:35 AM
Summons Issued as to 5832 Incorporated. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2015
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/25 2:27 PM
NOTICE re: Certificate of Interested Parties by Merry Mears . (Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
18 18 service Summons Submitted Thu 09/24 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Merry Mears. (Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2015
17 17 20 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/09 1:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Alaskan Bush Company, Damian Hartze filed by Merry Mears.(Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 07/09 10:53 AM
ORDER granting the Plaintiff's Motion (Doc.15 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days to file her First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/9/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Tue 06/16 1:18 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Order by Merry Mears.(Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 15, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 06/15 8:39 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answer and Motion for Entry of Default (Doc.12 ) is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/12/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
13 13 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 06/12 12:55 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Great Alaskan Bush Company and Damian Hartze and Strike Defendants' Answer Certificate of Service of Document No. 12 by Plaintiff Merry Mears. (Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Entry of Default Fri 06/12 11:44 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Great Alaskan Bush Company and Damian Hartze and Strike Defendants' Answer by Merry Mears.(Hodges, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint and Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit Default,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 11, 2015
11 11 order Order Thu 06/11 8:51 AM
ORDER that the parties file by 06/19/15, a disclosure of the exact legal status of Defendant Great Alaskan Bush Company. If it is nothing more than a name under which Defendant Hartze does business individually, then his answer is not improper. If it is a corporation or other legal entity, Defendant Great Alaskan Bush Company will be required to retain a lawyer, appropriately admitted to practice in this District Court. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/10/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/09 3:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Damian Hartze. (ACL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/02 10:43 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff show cause no later than 06/12/15, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, unless before then defaults have been entered or responsive pleadings have been filed. FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action after 06/12/15, for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/1/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
8 8 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 05/11 2:15 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:7 Service Executed Damian Hartze by Plaintiff Merry Mears. (Matheson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service Executed Mon 05/11 12:34 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Merry Mears: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons and Order upon Damian Hartze on 5/615. (Matheson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Service Executed Mon 05/11 12:33 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Merry Mears: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Order upon Great Alaskan Bush on 5/6/2015. (Matheson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2015
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 05/04 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Great Alaskan Bush Company, Damian Hartze.(BAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, May 01, 2015
4 4 service Summons Submitted Fri 05/01 2:26 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Merry Mears.(Matheson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, April 06, 2015
3 3 order Order Mon 04/06 3:12 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/6/15. (NKS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Mon 04/06 2:57 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11536642. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 15-00612 PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KMG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/06 2:52 PM
*COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-11536642 filed by Mary Mears. (submitted by Michelle Matheson)(KMG) *Modified to correct attorney submitted name on 4/6/2015 (KMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet