Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Russell F Nelms
Case #: 4:15-bk-41452
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2015
Terminated:Aug 30, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Nov 13, 2015

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WCC Partners, LP
2201 N Collins St Ste 110
Arlington, TX 76011-2694
Represented By
Eric A. Liepins
Eric A. Liepins, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


1. Bankruptcy judge OKs Woodhaven Country Club reorganization plan (star-telegram.com)
Submitted Tue 11/17/2015
2. Woodhaven Country Club seeks bankruptcy, former owner challenges (fwbusinesspress.com)
Submitted Fri 04/17/2015
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
124 124 order Final decree Tue 08/30 10:55 AM
Final decree. Entered on 8/30/2016 (Whitaker, Sherri)
Related: [-]