OMOREBEE et al v. NATIONAL LEAGUE OF JUSTICE AND SECURITY PROFESSIONALS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ketanji Brown Jackson |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00501 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 05:7101 Labor-Management Relations |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2015 4:21 PM EDT |
Defendant
FIRST COAST SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATIONAL LEAGUE OF JUSTICE AND SECURITY PROFESSIONALS
|
|
Non-Party Respondent
RONALD A. MIKELL
President and Registered Agent 7528 June Street
Springfiled, VA 22150 |
|
Plaintiff
BEN AYODELE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SETH DZUKEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EUNICE IWUJI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ENDAH NYAMBI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES OMOREBEE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution
Thu 07/14 4:11 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and DISMISSING case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/14/2016. (lckbj1) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 05/27 11:06 AM
ORDER VACATING Initial Scheduling Conference and requiring Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE on or before 6/17/2016, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with this Court's rules and orders. The Clerk is instructed to mail a copy of this Order to the individual plaintiffs at the addresses listed therein. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/27/2016. (lckbj1, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/25 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Inability to Meet and Confer with Plaintiffs in Order to File a Joint Report by FIRST COAST SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. (Gupta, Puja) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution
Fri 05/13 7:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by FIRST COAST SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC.(Gupta, Puja) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 12, 2016 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 04/12 4:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER clarifying status of litigation. In a Minute Order issued on April 6, 2016, this Court dismissed Plaintiffs' claims against the National League of Justice and Security Professionals for failure to prosecute those claims. This dismissal order was limited to the National League of Justice and Security Professionals, as the other defendant in this matter, First Coast Security Solutions, Inc., had previously answered Plaintiffs' Complaint. (See ECF No.7 .) The Court further set an Initial Scheduling Conference for June 2, 2016, in order to set a schedule for the litigation of Plaintiffs' claims against First Coast Security Solutions. (See ECF No.11 .) The Court expects that Plaintiffs and First Coast Security Solutions will comply with the meet and confer requirements and appear at the June 2 Conference. To the extent that First Coast Security Solutions is unable to reach Plaintiffs to conduct the meet and confer, it may file a notice informing the Court of this, and also seek dismissal of the claims against it. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/12/2016. (lckbj1) |
||
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/06 2:00 PM
ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 6/2/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/06/2016. (lckbj1) |
|
order
.Order
Wed 04/06 12:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On July 28, 2015, this Court entered a Minute Order requiring defendant National League of Justice and Security Professionals ("NLJSP") to answer the complaint by August 24, 2015. That date passed, and NLJSP neither filed an answer nor requested additional time to do so. On December 10, 2015, this Court entered a Minute Order requiring Plaintiff to show cause by January 8, 2016, why its claims against NLJSP should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, based on its failure to seek default or otherwise take any action with respect to its claims against NLJSP. Plaintiff has neither responded to that Order, nor requested additional time to do so. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against NLJSP are DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/06/2016. (lckbj1) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 12/10 5:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On July 28, 2015, this Court entered a Minute Order requiring defendant National League of Justice and Security Professionals ("NLJSP") to answer the complaint by August 24, 2015. That date has passed, and NLJSP has neither filed an answer nor requested additional time to do so. Plaintiff has not taken any further action with respect to its claims against NLJSP. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE by January 8, 2016, why its claims against NLJSP should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/10/2015. (lckbj1) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/28 1:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown,10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc to 7/22/2015. Defendant National League of Justice and Security Professionals shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/24/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/28/2015. (lckbj1) |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 07/24 9:53 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by RONALD A. MIKELL. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Ketani Brown Jackson on 07/23/2015 (jf) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/01 2:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On May 21, 2015, Defendant National League of Security Justice Professionals ("NLJSP"), purporting to appear pro se, submitted an answer to the Complaint in this matter, which was signed by Ronald Mikell, the President and registered agent for NLJSP. This Court rejected the document because a corporation cannot proceed pro se. In order to allow NLJSP sufficient time to secure counsel and correct this procedural deficiency, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for NLJSP to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to July 22, 2015, nunc pro tunc to May 21, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's9 Motion for Default Judgment is denied both because it is now moot, and also for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). See Charles Alan Wright et al., Fed. Prac. & Proc. § 2682 ("Prior to obtaining a default judgment under either Rule 55(b)(1) or Rule 55(b)(2), there must be an entry of default as provided by Rule 55(a).). The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Minute Order to NLJSP, c/o Ronald A. Mikell, at the address listed in NLJSP's May 21 filing. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/01/2015. (lckbj1) |
||
Tuesday, June 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 06/30 4:16 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by BEN AYODELE, SETH DZUKEY, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, EUNICE IWUJI, ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE(Kestell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 | ||
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Leave to File Denied
Wed 06/10 8:56 AM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Ronald A. Mikell, Answer to Complaint This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED A corporation cannot proceed pro se." Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/22/2015. (rdj) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/06 12:55 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by FIRST COAST SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC..(Gupta, Puja) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
.Order
Thu 04/30 4:09 PM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives; failure to conform to this Order may, when appropriate, result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/30/2015. (lckbj1) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 04/14 11:31 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FIRST COAST SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC., NATIONAL LEAGUE OF JUSTICE AND SECURITY PROFESSIONALS. (jf, ) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Mon 04/13 11:36 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, BEN AYODELE, EUNICE IWUJI re1 Complaint, filed by ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, BEN AYODELE, EUNICE IWUJI. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by EUNICE IWUJI, BEN AYODELE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE.(Kestell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice of QC
Thu 04/09 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re3 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to jimkestell@gmail.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Entered in error; Summonses incomplete; Refile with completed summonses (znmw, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Wed 04/08 12:52 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, BEN AYODELE, EUNICE IWUJI re1 Complaint, filed by ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, BEN AYODELE, EUNICE IWUJI. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by EUNICE IWUJI, BEN AYODELE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE.(Kestell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/08 12:40 PM
NOTICE by BEN AYODELE, SETH DZUKEY, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, EUNICE IWUJI, ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE re1 Complaint,(Kestell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/07 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4048610) filed by ENDAH NYAMBI, CHARLES OMOREBEE, TEMITOPE IBIJEMILUSI, SETH DZUKEY, BEN AYODELE, EUNICE IWUJI.(Kestell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/07 3:56 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth, ) |
||
service
Summons Not Issued
Tue 04/07 4:06 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to FIRST COAST SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC., NATIONAL LEAGUE OF JUSTICE AND SECURITY PROFESSIONALS (sth, ) |