Erie Hockey Club Limited
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas P Agresti |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-10380 |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | Erie Otters' bankruptcy pits Bassin against a billionaire (goerie.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/27/2015 | |
2. | Otters, in bankruptcy, owe city of Erie nearly $20,000 (goerie.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/20/2015 | |
3. | Most early bidders want to keep Otters in Erie (goerie.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/13/2015 | |
4. | Erie Otters file for bankruptcy in unusual case (goerie.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/08/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
369 | 369
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 10/22 3:18 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. 20 year disposition (amaz) |