Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John J Thomas
Case #: 4:15-bk-01441
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 06, 2015
Claims Deadline:Oct 31, 2016
Terminated:Oct 30, 2018
Plan Confirmed:May 10, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mussi Realty, LLC
1405 S Atherton St
State College, PA 16801-6206
Represented By
Donald M Hahn
Stover Mcglaughlin Gerace Et Al
contact info
Cristin Rosemary Long
Mcquaide Blasko
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101

GPO Feb 24 2017
Opinion of the Court re: Final Application for allowance of compensation & expenses (RE: related document(s)126, 131). (Sisk, Cathy)

1. State College, PA - Autoport Declares Bankruptcy to Avoid Foreclosure (statecollege.com)
Submitted Thu 04/09/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Thursday, November 01, 2018
168 168 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 11/02 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 167
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
167 167 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Final Decree Tue 10/30 3:23 PM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree Related [+]. (Wilson, Tonia)
Related: [-] 163