Member Case
Lead case is: 0:15-bk-16388

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Olson
Case #: 0:15-bk-16390
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 12, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hollywood Pavilion, LLC
2421 NE 32nd Ct
Lighthouse Point, FL 33064-8180
Represented By
Grace E. Robson, Esq.
contact info
Timothy R Bow
contact info
Jerry M Markowitz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Zana Michelle Scarlett
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Sunday, January 14, 2018
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/15 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/14/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Final Decree .
Friday, January 12, 2018
35 35 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 01/12 9:28 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11] Fri 01/12 9:27 AM
Final Decree . (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
33 33 trustee UST Notice of No Objection to Entry of Final Decree (Ch 11) [PAPERLESS] Thu 01/05 10:27 AM
The debtor in the above case has filed a Final Report and Motion for Entry of Final Decree. The debtor has certified that the case has been fully administered. Based upon the Debtor's Final Report, the United States Trustee has no objection to the Court granting the Debtor's Motion for Final Decree. The Debtor will remain liable for United States Trustee Quarterly Fees for each calendar quarter (or portion thereof) through the date the Final Decree is entered in this case. The United States Trustee reserves the right to seek to have the Final Decree vacated should any United States Trustee Quarterly Fees remain unpaid through date of closing by the court. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Scarlett, Zana)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Ballot Mon 08/29 8:19 PM
Chapter 11 Ballot ACCEPTING Plan. (Class in Plan: 3A; Amount: 45,647.73) Filed by Creditor Leonore Kallen (Alemany, Joaquin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2016
31 31 misc Chapter 11 Ballot Tue 08/23 1:06 PM
Chapter 11 Ballot ACCEPTING Plan. (Class in Plan: 3A; Amount: 50.00) by Creditor Paul Habrack Filed by Creditor Paul Habrack Paul Habrack (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
30 30 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS] Wed 07/01 11:49 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
29 29 misc Notice of Apptmt/Non-Apptmt of Creditors Committee Thu 05/21 10:45 AM
Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
28 28 trustee Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors [PAPERLESS] Wed 05/13 1:38 PM
Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee Related [+]. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 5/21/2015 at 01:30 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. (Scarlett, Zana)
Related: [-] 19 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Friday, May 08, 2015
27 27 misc Amended Document Fri 05/08 6:44 PM
Amended Document Local Form 4 Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC Related [+]. (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-] 23 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC
Thursday, May 07, 2015
26 26 misc Payroll/Sales Tax Report Thu 05/07 4:56 PM
Certified Payroll/Sales Tax Report and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Thu 05/07 4:55 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC Related [+]. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-] 21 Payroll/Sales Tax Report
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/07 10:05 AM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed 15-16390 JKO) [misc,schsia] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24473316. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
24 24 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Wed 05/06 8:02 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed in the Incorrect Case. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO WITHDRAW THE MISDOCKETED PLEADING AND FILE THE PLEADING IN THE CORRECT CASE WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-] 21 Certified Payroll/Sales Tax Report and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC.
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
23 23 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Tue 05/05 7:22 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule B,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] [Fee Amount $30] Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 4
22 22 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 05/05 7:12 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors (amended) Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Payroll/Sales Tax Report Tue 05/05 5:43 PM
Certified Payroll/Sales Tax Report and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 04/16 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/15/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 5/7/2015 at 10:00 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 7/6/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 8/5/2015.
Monday, April 13, 2015
19 19 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Mon 04/13 10:57 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 5/7/2015 at 10:00 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 7/6/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 8/5/2015. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 12, 2015
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/13 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/12/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 0:15-bk-16388 with Member Case 0:15-bk-16390 (Re:5 )
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/13 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/12/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge John K Olson Assigned to Case, Judge Raymond B Ray Removed from Case.
Saturday, April 11, 2015
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/12 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/11/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 4/22/2015. Schedule A due 4/22/2015. Schedule B due 4/22/2015. Schedule D due 4/22/2015. Schedule E due 4/22/2015. Schedule F due 4/22/2015. Schedule G due 4/22/2015. Schedule H due 4/22/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 4/22/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 4/22/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2015].
Friday, April 10, 2015
15 15 order Joint Administration Order Fri 04/10 3:35 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 0:15-bk-16388 with Member Case 0:15-bk-16390 Related [+] (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] #5
14 14 court Notice of Judge Reassignment (After Order) Fri 04/10 2:59 PM
Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge John K Olson Assigned to Case, Judge Raymond B Ray Removed from Case. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Notice of Judge Reassignment Fri 04/10 2:59 PM
Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge John K Olson Assigned to Case. Judge Raymond B Ray Removed from Case. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Fri 04/10 2:58 PM
Order Granting Motion to Reassign Case to The Honorable John K Olson Re: #11 (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 04/10 11:49 AM
Motion to Reassign Case to the Honorable John K. Olson Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Markowitz, Jerry)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Fri 04/10 11:34 AM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC Related [+]. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Transfer Case (Intra-District)
Thursday, April 09, 2015
9 9 misc Case Management Summary Thu 04/09 5:33 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Thu 04/09 4:27 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Fort Lauderdale Division to the Honorable John K. Olson Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 04/09 9:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Cherish A. Thompson Esq. Filed by Creditor Hollywood Property Investments, LLC. (Thompson, Cherish)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
6 6 court Notice of Deficiency Thu 04/09 8:46 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 4/22/2015. Schedule A due 4/22/2015. Schedule B due 4/22/2015. Schedule D due 4/22/2015. Schedule E due 4/22/2015. Schedule F due 4/22/2015. Schedule G due 4/22/2015. Schedule H due 4/22/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 4/22/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 4/22/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2015]. (Grooms, Desiree)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Joint Administration Wed 04/08 10:52 PM
Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-16389 15-16390 into Lead Case 15-16388 Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 04/08 10:33 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/08 10:32 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC. (Bow, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 04/08 10:28 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Grace E. Robson Esq. Related [+]. (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Hollywood Pavilion, LLC
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Wed 04/08 10:28 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman due by 05/8/2015 (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 04/08 10:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-16390 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24216791. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]