District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ketanji Brown Jackson
Case #: 1:15-cv-00516
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2015
Terminated:Mar 31, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 12:54 PM EDT
Defendant
JOHN KERRY
Represented By
Vesper Mei
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Sam M. Singer
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
ASHTON CARTER
Represented By
Vesper Mei
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Sam M. Singer
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lead Plaintiffs
NORA ALI MOMAREZ
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Petitioner
ABDULLA SAAIDI
on behalf of his minor children K.S., A.S., and N.S. 2773 Amazon Street
Dearborn, MI 48120
Represented By
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
KALED MOSSED AWNALLAH
10886 Arrowood Drive
Stockton, CA 95219
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
ZIAD AHMED SHAAWAT
13223 Syracuse Street
Detroit, MI 48212
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
ALAWI JABER SALEH
8723 Smart Street
Detroit, MI 48210
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
AHMED OTHMAN
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHAMMED OMER
9 Cook Street
Brooklyn, NY 11206
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
FATIMA ABDUL OBAD
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
SALEH MOTHANA
2602 East 28 St
Brooklyn, NY 11235
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
AHMED MIHSIN
17379 Eddon Street
Melvindale, MI 48122
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
IBRAHEEM HAFIZ KASSIM
9755 Lakepointe Dr.
Burke, VA 22015
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
SADA MOSSED AWNALLAH
10886 Arrowood Drive
Stockton, CA 95129
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
MOSSED AWNALLAH
individually and on behalf of minors M.K.A and H,.K.A 10886 Arrowood Drive
Stiockton, CA 95219
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
SAFFA ABDUL ELTAIEB
410 Henry Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMAL MOSSED AWNALLAH
10886 Arrowood Drive
Stockton, CA 95129
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
OSAMA YOUSEF ATIFAH
3320 sALINA sTREET
dEARBORN, MI 48120
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
ESMA ALMONTASER
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
AWHEAD ALMARQOZI
2773 Amazon Street
Dearborn, MI 48120
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
WAHBIAH ALI YAHYA
1550 Wyoming Street
Dearborn, MI 48120
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
MOATASEM ALI YAHYA
1550 WYOMING Street
Dearborn, MI 48120
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
AMEL ALI NASSER
individually and on behalf of her minor children S.M.N and A.M.N. 24450 Scott Street
Dearborn, MI 48124
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
WAIL YAHYA ALGHAZALIY
509 Golden Date Ave
Fircrest, WA 98466
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
ARWA AL-IRIANI
9039 Sligo Creek Pkwy Apt. 302
Silver Spring, MD 20901
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
FIKRI AL-DALALI
9325 McDougsll Street
Hamtramck, MI 48212
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
HALEEMA AHMED
individually and on behalf of her minor children A.A., F.A, N.A. and B.A. 139-25 - 87th Drive
Jamaica, NY 11435
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info
Plaintiff
AHMED ABDULLA MOHAMED
Represented By
Samer E. Khalaf
American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
contact info
Jenifer Wicks
Law Offices Of Jenifer Wicks
contact info

GPO May 17 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING 2 Plaintiffs' Complaint, as stated in this Court's 13 Order of March 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/17/2016. (lckbj2)
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
14 14 25 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 05/17 12:38 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING2 Plaintiffs' Complaint, as stated in this Court's13 Order of March 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/17/2016. (lckbj2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
13 13 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/31 6:59 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'8 Motion to Dismiss, for the reasons that will be set forth in a Memorandum Opinion that will be issued shortly absent unforeseen circumstances. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/31/2016. (lckbj2)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2015
12 12 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 09/18 4:08 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ASHTON CARTER, JOHN KERRY. (Singer, Sam)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2015
11 11 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 08/14 4:04 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SAFFA ABDUL ELTAIEB, AHMED ABDULLA MOHAMED, HALEEMA AHMED, FIKRI AL-DALALI, ARWA AL-IRIANI, WAIL YAHYA ALGHAZALIY, NORA ALI MOMAREZ, AMEL ALI NASSER, MOATASEM ALI YAHYA, WAHBIAH ALI YAHYA, AWHEAD ALMARQOZI, ESMA ALMONTASER, OSAMA YOUSEF ATIFAH, JAMAL MOSSED AWNALLAH, KALED MOSSED AWNALLAH, MOSSED AWNALLAH, SADA MOSSED AWNALLAH, IBRAHEEM HAFIZ KASSIM, AHMED MIHSIN, SALEH MOTHANA, FATIMA ABDUL OBAD, MOHAMMED OMER, AHMED OTHMAN, ABDULLA SAAIDI, ALAWI JABER SALEH, ZIAD AHMED SHAAWAT. (Wicks, Jenifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/30 3:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown,10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re8 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response to8 is due by 8/14/2015; Defendants' reply re8 is due by 9/18/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/30/2015. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/28 4:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Dismiss by SAFFA ABDUL ELTAIEB, AHMED ABDULLA MOHAMED, HALEEMA AHMED, FIKRI AL-DALALI, ARWA AL-IRIANI, WAIL YAHYA ALGHAZALIY, NORA ALI MOMAREZ, AMEL ALI NASSER, MOATASEM ALI YAHYA, WAHBIAH ALI YAHYA, AWHEAD ALMARQOZI, ESMA ALMONTASER, OSAMA YOUSEF ATIFAH, JAMAL MOSSED AWNALLAH, KALED MOSSED AWNALLAH, MOSSED AWNALLAH, SADA MOSSED AWNALLAH, IBRAHEEM HAFIZ KASSIM, AHMED MIHSIN, SALEH MOTHANA, FATIMA ABDUL OBAD, MOHAMMED OMER, AHMED OTHMAN, ABDULLA SAAIDI, ALAWI JABER SALEH, ZIAD AHMED SHAAWAT(Wicks, Jenifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 29, 2015
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 06/29 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown,9 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time for Filing Opposition to8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Opposition to8 is due by 7/31/2015; Defendants' reply in support of8 is due by 8/30/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/29/2015. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 06/24 3:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Dismiss by SAFFA ABDUL ELTAIEB, AHMED ABDULLA MOHAMED, HALEEMA AHMED, FIKRI AL-DALALI, ARWA AL-IRIANI, WAIL YAHYA ALGHAZALIY, NORA ALI MOMAREZ, AMEL ALI NASSER, MOATASEM ALI YAHYA, WAHBIAH ALI YAHYA, AWHEAD ALMARQOZI, ESMA ALMONTASER, OSAMA YOUSEF ATIFAH, JAMAL MOSSED AWNALLAH, KALED MOSSED AWNALLAH, MOSSED AWNALLAH, SADA MOSSED AWNALLAH, IBRAHEEM HAFIZ KASSIM, AHMED MIHSIN, SALEH MOTHANA, FATIMA ABDUL OBAD, MOHAMMED OMER, AHMED OTHMAN, ABDULLA SAAIDI, ALAWI JABER SALEH, ZIAD AHMED SHAAWAT(Wicks, Jenifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 15, 2015
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 06/15 4:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ASHTON CARTER, JOHN KERRY(Singer, Sam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Sadi v. Obama, No. 15-11314 slip op. (E.D. Mich June 8, 2015),
Att: 3 Exhibit Executive Order 12656,
Att: 4 Exhibit Memorandum of Agreement,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 06/09 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam M. Singer on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Vesper Mei (Singer, Sam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/23 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vesper Mei on behalf of All Defendants (Mei, Vesper)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
5 5 order .Order Fri 04/10 10:46 AM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives; failure to conform to this Order may, when appropriate, result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/10/2015. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/10 4:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting1 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that SAMER KHALAF is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/10/2015. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 04/09 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to ASHTON CARTER, JOHN KERRY, OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE-Executive Office of the Legal Advisor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (md, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Consent Form
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/09 2:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jenifer Wicks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wicks, Jenifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/09 2:01 AM
COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4050989) filed by WAHBIAH ALI YAHYA, AHMED OTHMAN, AHMED ABDULLA MOHAMED, IBRAHEEM HAFIZ KASSIM, FIKRI AL-DALALI, AMEL ALI NASSER, ALAWI JABER SALEH, ZIAD AHMED SHAAWAT, SALEH MOTHANA, KALED MOSSED AWNALLAH, MOHAMMED OMER, HALEEMA AHMED, AWHEAD ALMARQOZI, AHMED MIHSIN, NORA ALI MOMAREZ, FATIMA ABDUL OBAD, MOSSED AWNALLAH, SADA MOSSED AWNALLAH, ARWA AL-IRIANI, JAMAL MOSSED AWNALLAH, OSAMA YOUSEF ATIFAH, SAFFA ABDUL ELTAIEB, ESMA ALMONTASER, WAIL YAHYA ALGHAZALIY, MOATASEM ALI YAHYA, ABDULLA SAAIDI.(Wicks, Jenifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
1 1 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/09 1:57 AM
MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SAMER KHALAF TO BE ADMITTED AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE by SAFFA ABDUL ELTAIEB, AHMED ABDULLA MOHAMED, HALEEMA AHMED, FIKRI AL-DALALI, ARWA AL-IRIANI, WAIL YAHYA ALGHAZALIY, NORA ALI MOMAREZ, AMEL ALI NASSER, MOATASEM ALI YAHYA, WAHBIAH ALI YAHYA, AWHEAD ALMARQOZI, ESMA ALMONTASER, OSAMA YOUSEF ATIFAH, JAMAL MOSSED AWNALLAH, KALED MOSSED AWNALLAH, MOSSED AWNALLAH, SADA MOSSED AWNALLAH, IBRAHEEM HAFIZ KASSIM, AHMED MIHSIN, SALEH MOTHANA, FATIMA ABDUL OBAD, MOHAMMED OMER, AHMED OTHMAN, ABDULLA SAAIDI, ALAWI JABER SALEH, ZIAD AHMED SHAAWAT(Wicks, Jenifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Petitioner,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/09 9:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md, )
Related: [-]