Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Terry R Means
Case #: 4:15-cv-00280
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2015
Terminated:Mar 11, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 8:34 AM CDT
Defendant
USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC
Represented By
Marc Daniel Cabrera
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason L Sanders
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mac Churchill, Inc.
Represented By
R Douglas Scott
Anderson Tobin, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
FiServ, Inc.
Terminated: 05/06/2015
Represented By
Marc Daniel Cabrera
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason L Sanders
Locke Lord LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 11, 2016
22 22 order Order Fri 03/11 4:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS... Before the Court is the parties joint motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claims with prejudice due to settlement (doc. 20). Based on the parties representations, the Court GRANTS the motion. Plaintiffs claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 3/11/2016) (wxc)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Judgment Fri 03/11 4:28 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT.... In accordance with the Courts order granting the parties joint motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claims filed this day, it is the judgment of the Court that Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs under 28 U.S.C. §1920. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 3/11/2016) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
20 20 motion Dismiss Thu 03/10 1:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Mac Churchill, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order - Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice,
Att: 2 Proposed Order - Final Judgment
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
19 19 order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/06 4:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS: Before the Court is the parties' joint motion to abate proceedings (doc.18 ). The parties asks the court to stay this case and all related deadlines for sixty days in order to work toward settlement of this case. After review, the Court GRANTS the motion. This case and all related deadlines are hereby STAYED until March 7, 2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the Court of the status of their negotiations no later than March 11, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 1/6/2016) (tln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/05 8:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Mac Churchill, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
17 17 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 12/16 2:43 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Abate Proceedings. This case and all related deadlines are hereby STAYED until December 29, 2015. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the Court of the status of their negotiations no later than January 5, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 12/16/2015) (tln)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 12/14 11:35 PM
STATUS REPORT and Motion to Abate Proceedings filed by USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
15 15 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 10/13 3:57 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Stay (14 Motion to Stay filed by USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC, Mac Churchill, Inc. terminated.) Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2015. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 10/13/2015) (mem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
14 14 motion Stay Wed 09/30 9:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay and Status Report filed by Mac Churchill, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 25, 2015
13 13 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 06/25 3:13 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay (12 Motion to Stay filed by USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC, Mac Churchill, Inc. terminated.) This case and all related deadlines are hereby STAYED. If the parties negotiations do not result in settlement, they shall file a Joint Status Report advising the Court of the status of their negotiations no later than September 30, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 6/25/2015) (mem)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
12 12 motion Stay Fri 06/19 9:30 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Mac Churchill, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Abate Proceedings
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
11 11 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 06/02 4:25 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint no later than June 19, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 6/2/2015) (mem)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Tue 06/02 4:22 PM
ORDER CHANGING CASE STYLE...the clerk of this Court shall change the style of this cause to Mac Churchill, Inc. v. USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC. All future filings in this cause shall bear the new style and the cause number 4:15-CV-280-Y. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 6/2/2015) (mem)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 16, 2015
9 9 motion Extension of Time Sat 05/16 5:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/07 8:59 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss. After review, the Court GRANTS the motion. Mac Churchills claims against Fiserve are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Party FiServ, Inc. terminated. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 5/6/2015) (mem)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2015
7 7 motion Dismiss Fri 05/01 10:12 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) With Prejudice filed by FiServ, Inc., Mac Churchill, Inc. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/29 4:45 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer FiServ, Inc. answer due 5/20/2015; USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC answer due 5/20/2015. (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 4/29/2015) (trs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 04/23 8:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FiServ, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 04/23 8:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FiServ, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/17 4:05 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Original Petition filed by FiServ, Inc., USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Enlarge
Thursday, April 09, 2015
2 2 qcref Means Thu 04/09 4:47 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mem)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/09 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 017-276927-15 filed by USB Dealer Services North Star Exchange, LLC, FiServ, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-6720225) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cabrera, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket - List of Transactions,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Index of Documents Filed in State Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C-2 - Filing letter to Clerk,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C-3 - Service Request Form,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C-4 - Civil Case Information Sheet