Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:11-bk-35627
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Oct 11, 2011
Dismissed:Dec 11, 2012
Terminated:Dec 27, 2012

Debtor
Priscilla Alden Walker
4022 Stonebridge Dr
Dallas, TX 75204-1632
Represented By
Olson Nicoud & Gueck, L.L.P.
contact info
Taylor Willingham, P.C.
contact info
Robert M. Nicoud, Jr.
Olson, Nicoud & Gueck, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
UST U.S. Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242
Represented By
Nancy Sue Resnick
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2013 7:07 PM CST
Friday, September 02, 2011
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 11-35627 11) [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt number 14173721, amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Priscilla Alden Walker (Nicoud, Robert) (12 pgs)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of credit counseling dated 9/2/2011 . Filed by Debtor Priscilla Alden Walker. (Nicoud, Robert) (1 pg)
Related: [-]
4 4 Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor Priscilla Alden Walker. (Nicoud, Robert) (1 pg)
Related: [-]