New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:15-bk-16475
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Jun 04, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 05, 2015
Terminated:Dec 06, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Jul 06, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
American Boychoir School
75 Mapleton Rd
Princeton, NJ 08540-9669
Represented By
Brian W. Hofmeister
Law Firm Of Brian W. Hofmeister
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee One Newark Center Suite 2100
Newark, NJ 07102

Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
171 171 misc Ch 11 Post Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report Wed 12/07 9:16 AM
Chapter 11 Post Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report 10/01/2016 through 10/31/2016 filed by Brian W. Hofmeister on behalf of American Boychoir School. (Hofmeister, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
170 170 order Final Decree Tue 12/06 9:26 AM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (wdr)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/06 9:28 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (wdr)
Related: [-]