Scull v. Hennegan et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Frank P Geraci, Jr |
Referred: | Jeremiah J Mccarthy |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00309 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 11:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
John P. Bartolomei
|
|
Defendant
Brian Del Porto
|
|
Defendant
Thomas G. Ewing
|
|
Defendant
Patrick K. Hennegan
|
|
Defendant
Roger Trevino
|
|
Plaintiff
John T. Scull
422 10th Street
Niagara Falls, NY 14303 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
185 | 185
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/03 2:37 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to183 Notice of Appeal filed by John T. Scull. Appellant's Form D-P was due May 14, 2020. The case is deemed in default. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal will be dismissed effective July 1, 2020 if the form is not filed by that date. (JLV) |