Original Case: 1:14-cv-07146

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-01087
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2015
Terminated:Jul 06, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 1:03 AM EST
Defendant
Does, 1 through 20
Defendant - Appellee
Russell Wendell Simmons, in his individual and professioonal capacity as Editor and Chief of Global Grind Digital
Represented By
Russell Wendell Simmons
Global Grind Digital
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Brittany Lewis, in her individual and professional capacity as Global Grind Digital, internet news reported
Represented By
Brittany Lewis
Global Grind Digital
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Global Grind Digital
Represented By
Global Grind Digital
Global Grind Digital
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Accel Partners, a corporation and associate partner with Global Grind Digital
Represented By
Accel Partners
-
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Calvin Edward Cooksey, in his individual capacity as biological father parent of Christopher Edwind Cooksey, who is also known as Lonny Breaux, Christopher Lonny Breaux, and legal name (allegedly) Christopher Francis Ocean, Frank Ocean
Represented By
Calvin Edward Cooksey
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 12:46 AM EST
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Calvin Edward Cooksey, FILED. [1480863] 15-1087 [Entered: 04/09/2015 11:45 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/05/2014, RECEIVED.[1480866] 15-1087 [Entered: 04/09/2015 11:47 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/05/2014, RECEIVED.[1480868] 15-1087 [Entered: 04/09/2015 11:47 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/04/2015, RECEIVED.[1480871] 15-1087 [Entered: 04/09/2015 11:48 AM]
Related: [-]