Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael W Mosman
Case #: 3:15-cv-00617
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2015
Terminated:Apr 28, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Oct 11, 2015 5:15 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Jane Roe
Represented By
Bonnie Richardson
Folawn Alterman & Richardson LLP
contact info
Zachariah H. Allen
Folawn Alterman & Richardson
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jane Roe
Represented By
Bonnie Richardson
Folawn Alterman & Richardson LLP
contact info
Zachariah H. Allen
Folawn Alterman & Richardson
contact info
Defendant
Reed Institute
Defendant
Jane Roe
Represented By
Bonnie Richardson
Folawn Alterman & Richardson LLP
contact info
Zachariah H. Allen
Folawn Alterman & Richardson
contact info
Defendant
The Reed Institute
Represented By
Damien T. Munsinger
Barran Liebman LLP
contact info
Richard C. Hunt
Barran Liebman, LLP
contact info
Paula A. Barran
Barran Liebman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
Represented By
David H. Angeli
Angeli Ungar Law Group LLC
contact info
Courtney Angeli
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Kristen L. Tranetzki
Angeli Ungar Law Group LLC
contact info

GPO Aug 17 2015
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART/DENYING IN PART Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Asserted by Defendant The Reed Institute 22 and Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Asserted by Jane Roe 30. Signed on 8/17/15 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) Modified on 8/18/2015 to correct typo (jtj).
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
84 84 order Order Wed 06/22 4:30 PM
Order of Dismissal. Based upon the Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. Signed on 6/22/16 by Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Related: [-]
83 83 order Order on Motion for Judgment Wed 06/22 4:28 PM
ORDER: GRANTING Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice81 . Ordered by Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Related: [-]