Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William S Shulman
Case #: 3:11-bk-31526
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2011
Terminated:Jun 13, 2013

Debtor
Crestview Open MRI, Inc.
194 E Redstone Ave Ste A
Crestview, FL 32539-5368
Represented By
Thomas B. Woodward
Thomas B. Woodward, Atty.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Jason H. Egan
Office Of The U. S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2016 9:01 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 14, 2011
Trustee's Memo re 341 Meeting: Please schedule Meeting of Creditors to be held at 10:45 a. m. (CST) on 10/27/2011 in Pensacola, Florida filed by United States Trustee. (Collins, Leah)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition [ Fee Amount $1039] filed by Crestview Open MRI, Inc. (Woodward, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-31526 [misc,volp11] (1039.00) filing fee. Receipt number 2476227, amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Affidavit Re: Thomas B. Woodward filed by Thomas B. Woodward on behalf of Crestview Open MRI, Inc.. (Woodward, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 Application to Employ Thomas B. Woodward (P.O. Box 10058, Tallahassee, FL 32302) as Debtors Attorney filed by Thomas B. Woodward on behalf of Crestview Open MRI, Inc.. (Woodward, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Jason H. Egan on behalf of United States Trustee. (Egan, Jason)
Related: [-]