In Re William Kristoffer Wolf
Montana District Court | |
Judge: | Susan P Watters |
Referred: | Carolyn S Ostby |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Mandate - SDM
Mon 12/14 4:10 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by William Krisstofer Wolf. Appeal dismissed for failure to pay the docketing/filing fees in case. (TAG, ) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Order - SDM
Thu 10/22 9:44 AM
ORDER of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by William Krisstofer Wolf. If appellant wishes to pursue this appeal despite the court's finding that it isfrivolous then, within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay $505.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and file proof of payment with this court. (TAG, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Order - SDM
Tue 06/30 4:42 PM
ORDER of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by William Krisstofer Wolf. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shallcomply fully with the May 28, 2015 order. (TAG, ) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/30 4:38 PM
ORDER OF USCA re No. 15-71557 Petition for Writ of Mandamus DENIED. (TAG, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order to Strike - MT
Tue 06/02 4:15 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE re16 MOTION filed by William Krisstofer Wolf. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/2/2015. Mailed to Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Order/Judgment - MT
Mon 06/01 2:09 PM
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Petitioner William Krisstofer Wolf. Motions referred to Carolyn S Ostby. (TAG, ) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Order - SDM
Thu 05/28 2:48 PM
ORDER of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by William Krisstofer Wolf. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (TAG, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT
Tue 05/26 2:41 PM
ORDER. Other than the notice of appeal9 , all post-judgment submissions (8 ,10 ,11 ) are STRICKEN from the record. No action will be taken on them. The Clerk shall discard any further submissions under this cause number. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/26/2015. Mailed to Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/26 8:59 AM
USCA Case Number 15-71557 for petition for writ of mandamus received in the Clerk's Office of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (TAG, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Order/Judgment - MT
Wed 05/20 2:18 PM
Motion to Compel Return by Petitioner William Krisstofer Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Order/Judgment - MT
Wed 05/20 2:17 PM
Petition for Writ of Mandamust by Petitioner William Krisstofer Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal - Order - MT
Mon 05/18 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to6 Order Dismissing Case by William Krisstofer Wolf. Filing fee $ 505 not paid. (TAG, ) |
|
Att: 1 IFP | ||
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/08 2:41 PM
'Next-Friend' Submissions re William Kristoffer Wolf (TAG, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 05/06 9:44 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/06 9:41 AM
RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER. The Recommendation of Judge Ostby is ADOPTED. The petition1 is DISMISSED. Any appeal from this disposition would be taken in bad faith. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/6/2015. Mailed to Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Brief/Response to Order - MT
Mon 05/04 2:16 PM
Brief/Response to2 Order filed by William Krisstofer Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Brief/Response to Order - MT
Mon 04/27 3:02 PM
Brief/Response by Attorney-in-Fact to2 Order re William Krisstofer Wolf. (TAG, ) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Letter | ||
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/17 2:48 PM
Demand for Habeas Corpus by William Krisstofer Wolf (TAG, ) |
|
Att: 1 Power of Attorney | ||
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Setting - MT
Thu 04/16 2:15 PM
Order. Wolf is allowed until April 30, 2015, to respond to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 4/16/2015. Mailed to Wolf with ifp form; documents forwarded to Mark Werner as directed. (TAG, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/16 10:18 AM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Krisstofer Wolf (TAG, ) |