Celia O Gonzalez v. M and T Bank et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02811 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 13, 2015 5:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP 4665 MacArthur Court, Suite 280
Newport Beach, CA 92660 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
M and T Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quality Loan Service Corporation
|
|
Movant
Emilio F Castillo
DISTRICT LAW FIRM 3380 Flair Drive, Suite 233
El Monte, CA 91731 |
|
Movant
Celia O Gonzalez
DISTRICT LAW FIRM 3380 Flair Drive, Suite 233
El Monte, CA 91731 |
|
Movant
Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP 4665 MacArthur Court, Suite 280
Newport Beach, CA 92660 |
Represented By
|
Movant
M&T Bank
M&T Bank Wright, Finlay & Zak LLP 4665 MacArthur Court, Suite 280
Newport Beacj, CA 92660 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilio F Castillo
an individual DISTRICT LAW FIRM 3380 Flair Drive, Suite 233
El Monte, CA 91731 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Celia O Gonzalez
an individual DISTRICT LAW FIRM 3380 Flair Drive, Suite 233
El Monte, CA 91731 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 06/19 11:46 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk) |
|
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Remand Case to State Court
Fri 06/19 11:45 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: On 6/9/2015, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause ("OSC") questioning the bases for diversity subject matter jurisdiction16 . The removing Defendants have now filed a response indicating that "a potential that a minority member of one of the members of Lakeview Financial LLC may defeat diversity" and therefore they now request that this lawsuit be remanded back to state court17 . Thus, for the reasons stated in the Court's OSC and as further indicated in the removing Defendants' response, this action is remanded back to state court forthwith and all previously set dates in this case are taken off-calendar. Case remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case Number BC571871. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) Court Reporter: None Present. (gk) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear
Thu 06/18 12:37 PM
First REQUEST for Leave of Le'Roy T. Roberson to Appear for Telephonic Appearance filed by plaintiffs Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez. Request set for hearing on 6/22/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.(Roberson, Le'Roy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Request to Make Telephonic Appearance | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear
Tue 06/16 1:33 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Nicole S. Dunn to Appear for Telephonic Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank. Request set for hearing on 6/22/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.(Attorney Nicole S Dunn added to party Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole S Dunn added to party M and T Bank(pty:dft))(Dunn, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 06/11 4:25 PM
REPLY to Court's Order to Show Cause RE Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank. (Penny, Patricia) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Tue 06/09 1:03 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBJECT MATTERJURISDICTION by Judge George H. Wu. The Removing Defendants may file a response to this Order to Show Cause (limited to 5 pages) by June 16, 2015, addressing the two issues noted above. The Court will hold a hearing on the issue on June 22, 2015, at 8:30 a.m., unless it issues an order remanding the matter to state court (and vacating the hearing) before that date. **SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS** (jag) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 06/08 4:24 PM
REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank. (Penny, Patricia) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/01 1:07 PM
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Plaintiffs Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez.(Travillion, Tiffany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/01 1:01 PM
NOTICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez. Name Change of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Travillion, Tiffany) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue
Wed 04/29 10:29 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS M&T BANK AND LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC TO RESCHEDULE THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Defendants' Application11 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is continued to 7/6/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (gk) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Fri 04/24 4:24 PM
APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 4, 2015 to July 6, 2015 filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank.(Penny, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 04/21 3:24 PM
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for June 4, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. AJoint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than May 21, 2015. (kss) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 04/21 2:58 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu upon filing of the complaint (kss) |
|
8 | 8
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 04/21 10:32 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 7 filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank.(Penny, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 04/21 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank. Motion set for hearing on 6/22/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.(Penny, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form
Fri 04/17 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachments No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. #1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs (jp) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 04/17 11:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 04/17 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Thu 04/16 1:53 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Movants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M&T Bank. as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 .(Penny, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/16 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M&T Bank, (Penny, Patricia) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/16 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC571871 Receipt No: 0973-15555011 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants M&T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attorney Patricia L Penny added to party Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Patricia L Penny added to party M&T Bank(pty:bkmov))(Penny, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 04/17 11:31 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT against DefendantS Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M and T Bank, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Does 1 through 100. Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiffs Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/6/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT3 ). (jp) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/17 11:36 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez, upon Defendant M and T Bank served on 2/9/2015, answer due 3/2/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patricia L Penny, Attorney in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT on 3/30/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT3 ). (jp) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/17 11:40 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez, upon Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation served on 3/20/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Glory B, Person in charge (F, 33 yrs, 5'6", 185 lbs, Filipino, Black). By Serving Bouniet Louvan, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/30/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT3 ). (jp) |
||
service
Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
Fri 04/17 11:42 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Emilio F Castillo, Celia O Gonzalez, upon Defendant M and T Bank acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/4/2015, answer due 3/25/2015. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Patricia L Penny, Attorney for defendant M and T Bank. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/30/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT3 ). (jp) |