New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:15-mj-01255
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2015
Last checked: Friday Apr 17, 2015 11:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Oppenheim (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Janis Echenberg
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
Alexander Joshua Wilson
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/17/2015 11:05 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
ORAL ORDER TO SEAL CASE as to Michael Oppenheim. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/15/2015)(gq)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Michael Oppenheim (1) in violation of 18 U.S.C. 656, and 1343; 15 U.S.C. 78j(b),78ff, 80b-6 and 80b-17. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (gq)
Related: [-]