Tanalgo v. JP Morgan Chase et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta A Preska |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02823 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2015 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 01, 2015 8:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase
|
|
Defendant
Unitas - Saint Mark's Place - Institute for Mental Health
|
|
Defendant
Post Graduate Center for Mental Health
|
|
Defendant
North Central Bronx Hospital
|
|
Defendant
New York Presbyterian Hospital
|
|
Defendant
New York Police Department
|
|
Defendant
New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation
|
|
Defendant
New York City & State
|
|
Defendant
NYPD Community Affairs
|
|
Defendant
MTA Connections
|
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase-Legal
|
|
Defendant
Human Resources Administration
|
|
Defendant
FEGS Health and Human Services
|
|
Defendant
FBI-New York
|
|
Defendant
District Attorney of New York-Manhattan
|
|
Defendant
Citigroup/Smith Barney
|
|
Defendant
Bronx District Attorney
|
|
Defendant
Bowery Residents Committee
|
|
Defendant
Beth Israel/Mount Sinai
|
|
Defendant
Bellevue Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Attorney General-New York
|
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Tanalgo
P.O. Box 490
New York, NY 10163 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Tue 09/06 7:49 AM
Mailed a copy of24 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, to Arlene Tanalgo P.O. Box 490 New York, NY 10163. (ca) |
||
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER denying22 Motion to Reopen Case. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 22) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/1/2016) (lmb) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Fri 09/02 3:36 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:24 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lmb) |
||
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo, re: MOTION TO OPEN CASE/COMPLAINT(CASE NOT TRIED). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION TO REOPEN. PREVIOUS OSHA CASE WAS SETTLED. CASE HAS MERIT.. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arlene Tanalgo. USCA Case Number 15-2784 Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams , 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2).. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/28/2015. (nd) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 09/01 11:57 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:20 Notice of Appeal,. (nd) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Tue 09/01 11:57 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arlene Tanalgo were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) |
||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL from18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint),,17 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit.(nd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
appeal
Appeal Fee Due
Tue 09/01 11:57 AM
Appeal Fee Due: for20 Notice of Appeal,. $505.00 Appeal fee due by 9/11/2015. IFP denied on 7/28/2015.(nd) |
||
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Arlene Tanalgo, dated 8/7/15 re: PRO-SE/YOUR DISMISSAL(LAP's DISMISSAL). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
misc
Mail Notice of Right to Appeal
Tue 08/04 4:42 PM
Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re:17 Order of Dismissal,18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Arlene Tanalgo P.O. Box 490 New York, NY 10163. (soh) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:17 Order of Dismissal,18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (kl) | ||
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
![]() LETTER addressed to Pro Se Intake Unit from Arlene Tanalgo re: Docket uploaded in ECF/System. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(lmb) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION to Seal (AMENDED COMPLAINT). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(rdz) |
|
13 | 13
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 7/10/15 re: Plaintiff notifies the Court that she has submitted the Amended Complaint, and she is requesting to seal the case, as documents submitted(evidence) contain medical, legal, and FBI reports etc. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo re: (AMENDMENT) Plaintiff informs the Court that the amendment request should be done before the deadline; that she may need more time, but expects to finalize this week. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 6/11/15 re: AMENDMENT/REQUEST BY JUDGE, ISSUES: CIVIL RIGHTS, MALICE: INTENT TO HARM, FRAUD, AND OTHERS. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 5/21/15 re: AMENDMENT ORDER DATED 5/14/15 (PLEASE SEE FBI REPORT DATED AUG 2012/ PLEASE NOTE THAT I AM IN HUD HOUSING.) Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
9 | 9
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 5/21/15 re: AMENDMENT ORDER DATED 5/14/15/ CLAIMS: CIVIL RIGHTS, FRAUD, INDENTITY FRAUD, FABRICATED MEDICAL EVALUATION BY BRC & BETH ISRAEL/ BETH ISRAEL WAS SUPPOSED TO CEASE & DESIST. JUDGE ORDERED IN MY FAVOR ETC. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
8 | 8
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 5/21/15 re: ORDER AMENDMENT/ PLEASE REVIEW. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Tue 05/19 4:43 PM
Mailed a copy of7 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Arlene Tanalgo P.O. Box 490 New York, NY 10163. (soh) |
||
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (kko) | ||
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:7 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (kko) | ||
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/6/2015) (vj) |
|
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 05/06 11:40 AM
Mailed a copy of6 Order Granting IFP Application to Arlene Tanalgo. (vj) |
||
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 4/22/15 re: (REFERENCE TO MATTERS ON 04/17/15 AND 04/20/15), CAUSE/NATURE(FRAUD, SLANDER, ETC.). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo re: CLARIFICATION. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
![]() LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo re: CHARGES FILED. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |