New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:15-cv-02823
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2015
Terminated:Jul 28, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Oct 01, 2015 8:10 AM EDT
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase
Defendant
Unitas - Saint Mark's Place - Institute for Mental Health
Defendant
Post Graduate Center for Mental Health
Defendant
North Central Bronx Hospital
Defendant
New York Presbyterian Hospital
Defendant
New York Police Department
Defendant
New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation
Defendant
New York City & State
Defendant
NYPD Community Affairs
Defendant
MTA Connections
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase-Legal
Defendant
Human Resources Administration
Defendant
FEGS Health and Human Services
Defendant
FBI-New York
Defendant
District Attorney of New York-Manhattan
Defendant
Citigroup/Smith Barney
Defendant
Bronx District Attorney
Defendant
Bowery Residents Committee
Defendant
Beth Israel/Mount Sinai
Defendant
Bellevue Hospital
Defendant
Attorney General-New York
Plaintiff
Arlene Tanalgo
P.O. Box 490
New York, NY 10163


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
misc Mail Order by Certified Mail Tue 09/06 7:49 AM
Mailed a copy of24 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, to Arlene Tanalgo P.O. Box 490 New York, NY 10163. (ca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Fri 09/02 3:35 PM
ORDER denying22 Motion to Reopen Case. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 22) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/1/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk Fri 09/02 3:36 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:24 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
23 23 misc Letter Fri 05/13 12:07 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo, re: MOTION TO OPEN CASE/COMPLAINT(CASE NOT TRIED). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
22 22 2 pgs motion Reopen Case Mon 04/18 2:41 PM
MOTION TO REOPEN. PREVIOUS OSHA CASE WAS SETTLED. CASE HAS MERIT.. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2015
21 21 1 pgs appeal USCA Mandate Tue 12/29 3:02 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arlene Tanalgo. USCA Case Number 15-2784 Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams , 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2).. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/28/2015. (nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 09/01 11:57 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:20 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Tue 09/01 11:57 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arlene Tanalgo were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
20 20 4 pgs appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 09/01 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint),,17 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit.(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis
appeal Appeal Fee Due Tue 09/01 11:57 AM
Appeal Fee Due: for20 Notice of Appeal,. $505.00 Appeal fee due by 9/11/2015. IFP denied on 7/28/2015.(nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2015
19 19 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 08/07 4:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Arlene Tanalgo, dated 8/7/15 re: PRO-SE/YOUR DISMISSAL(LAP's DISMISSAL). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
misc Mail Notice of Right to Appeal Tue 08/04 4:42 PM
Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re:17 Order of Dismissal,18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Arlene Tanalgo P.O. Box 490 New York, NY 10163. (soh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
18 18 1 pgs CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued July 28, 2015, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/28/2015) (kl)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Because the amended complaint includes medical information, the Court grants in part Plaintiff's motion to seal (ECF No. 14) and directs the Clerk of Court to file the amended complaint as a court-view only entry. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/28/2015) (kl)
Related: [-]
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:17 Order of Dismissal,18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (kl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
16 16 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 07/24 4:13 PM
LETTER addressed to Pro Se Intake Unit from Arlene Tanalgo re: Docket uploaded in ECF/System. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(lmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
14 14 motion Seal Document Tue 07/14 1:20 PM
MOTION to Seal (AMENDED COMPLAINT). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(rdz)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 07/10 3:51 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 7/10/15 re: Plaintiff notifies the Court that she has submitted the Amended Complaint, and she is requesting to seal the case, as documents submitted(evidence) contain medical, legal, and FBI reports etc. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
12 12 misc Letter Mon 07/06 3:02 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo re: (AMENDMENT) Plaintiff informs the Court that the amendment request should be done before the deadline; that she may need more time, but expects to finalize this week. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2015
11 11 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 06/11 1:11 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 6/11/15 re: AMENDMENT/REQUEST BY JUDGE, ISSUES: CIVIL RIGHTS, MALICE: INTENT TO HARM, FRAUD, AND OTHERS. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
10 10 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 05/21 3:50 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 5/21/15 re: AMENDMENT ORDER DATED 5/14/15 (PLEASE SEE FBI REPORT DATED AUG 2012/ PLEASE NOTE THAT I AM IN HUD HOUSING.) Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Thu 05/21 3:47 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 5/21/15 re: AMENDMENT ORDER DATED 5/14/15/ CLAIMS: CIVIL RIGHTS, FRAUD, INDENTITY FRAUD, FABRICATED MEDICAL EVALUATION BY BRC & BETH ISRAEL/ BETH ISRAEL WAS SUPPOSED TO CEASE & DESIST. JUDGE ORDERED IN MY FAVOR ETC. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Thu 05/21 3:42 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 5/21/15 re: ORDER AMENDMENT/ PLEASE REVIEW. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
misc Mail Order by Certified Mail Tue 05/19 4:43 PM
Mailed a copy of7 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Arlene Tanalgo P.O. Box 490 New York, NY 10163. (soh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2015
7 7 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 15-CV-2823 (LAP). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/14/2015) (kko)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (kko)
Related: [-]
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:7 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (kko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
6 6 order Order Granting IFP Application Wed 05/06 11:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/6/2015) (vj)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by Certified Mail Wed 05/06 11:40 AM
Mailed a copy of6 Order Granting IFP Application to Arlene Tanalgo. (vj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
5 5 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 04/23 10:03 AM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo dated 4/22/15 re: (REFERENCE TO MATTERS ON 04/17/15 AND 04/20/15), CAUSE/NATURE(FRAUD, SLANDER, ETC.). Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2015
4 4 misc Letter Mon 04/20 3:23 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo re: CLARIFICATION. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
3 3 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 04/17 3:37 PM
LETTER from Arlene Tanalgo re: CHARGES FILED. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2015
1 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Arlene Tanalgo.(sac)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]