Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Pamela S Hollis
Case #: 1:11-bk-39381
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Dec 28, 2011
Dismissed:Nov 15, 2012
Terminated:Aug 19, 2013

Debtor
Gloria Jean Sykes
6016 N Avondale Ave
Chicago, IL 60631-3114
Represented By
Richard Busse
Richard P. Busse Attorney-At-Law
contact info
Richard P. Busse
Richard P. Busse Attorney At Law
contact info
Jeffrey R Esser
Law Office Of Jeffrey Esser
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Denise A Delaurent
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/03/2017 1:15 PM CST
Wednesday, September 28, 2011
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $0, Filed by Jeffrey R Esser on behalf of Gloria Jean Sykes (Esser, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Social Security Number(s) Filed by Jeffrey R Esser on behalf of Gloria Jean Sykes. (Esser, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Jeffrey R Esser on behalf of Gloria Jean Sykes. (Esser, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Jeffrey R Esser on behalf of Gloria Jean Sykes. (Esser, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments Filed by Jeffrey R Esser on behalf of Gloria Jean Sykes. Final Installment Payment due by 01/26/2012. (Esser, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]